This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 01/01/2021 at 06:04:58 (UTC).

Smith v. First Choice Loan Srv

Case Summary

On 11/02/2020 Smith filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against First Choice Loan Srv. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11101

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Amerihome Mortgage Company, L.L.C.

First Choice Loan Services, Incorporated

Plaintiff / Appellant

Sean W. Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Sam David Smith Esq.

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, L.L.P.

600 Travis Street

Houston, TX 77002

Marc James Ayers Esq.

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, L.L.P.

1819 5Th Avenue, N., 1 Federal Place

Birmingham, AL 35203-2119

Daniel David Tostrud Esq.

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward, P.L.L.C.

1700 Pacific Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Katherine Elrich

Attorney at Cobb Martinez Woodward, P.L.L.C.

1700 Pacific Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Charles A. Caldwell II

Attorney at Law Offices of Charles A. Caldwell, P.L.L.C.

P.O. Box 601174

Dallas, TX 75360

 

Court Documents

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/04/2021 for Appellant Sean W. Smith. [20-11101] (DDL) [Entered: 11/23/2020 08:22 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11101] (Marc James Ayers ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:48 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11101] (Daniel David Tostrud ) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:43 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11101] (Katherine Elrich ) [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:48 AM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9439303-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-11101] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:22 AM]

Open Document

PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Sean W. Smith [20-11101] (MFY) [Entered: 11/02/2020 02:13 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/04/2021 for Appellant Sean W. Smith. [20-11101] (DDL) [Entered: 11/23/2020 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-11101] (DDL) [Entered: 11/23/2020 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Daniel David Tostrud for Appellee First Choice Loan Services, Incorporated in 20-11101 [20-11101] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marc James Ayers for party(s) Appellee Amerihome Mortgage Company, L.L.C., in case 20-11101 [20-11101] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/19/2020 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11101] (Marc James Ayers ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Katherine Elrich for party(s) Appellee First Choice Loan Services, Incorporated, in case 20-11101 [20-11101] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/18/2020 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-11101] (Daniel David Tostrud ) [Entered: 11/17/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-11101] (Katherine Elrich ) [Entered: 11/17/2020 08:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 4:20-CV-321. Electronic ROA due on 11/25/2020. [20-11101] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9439303-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-11101] (RAJ) [Entered: 11/10/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Sean W. Smith [20-11101] (MFY) [Entered: 11/02/2020 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where First Choice Loan Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERIHOME MORTGAGE COMPANY LLC is a litigant