This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/29/2021 at 11:17:11 (UTC).

SE Property Holdings, LLC v. Neverve LLC

Case Summary

On 05/21/2021 SE Property Holdings, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Neverve LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-11736

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

NEVERVE LLC

Plaintiff / Appellant

SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Clark R. Hammond

Attorney at Wallace Jordan Ratliff & Brandt, LLC

Po Box 530910

Birmingham, AL 35253

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Richard M. Gaal

Attorney at McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, LLC

Po Box 35011 N Water St Ste 13290

Mobile, AL 36601

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1 - Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint

Open Document #1

Response to Jurisdictional Question with Motion

Open Document #3

Appellant Appendix Volume Three

Open Document #2

Appellant Appendix Volume Two

Open Document #1

Appellant Appendix Filed

Open Document

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

Open Document #1

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #4

Order, DE #69

Open Document #3

Judgment, DE #70

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Jurisdictional Question with incorporated motion to amend document filed by Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. [21-11736] (ECF: Richard Gaal) [Entered: 07/26/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. 3 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 07/23/2021 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppendix filed [3 VOLUMES] by Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. [21-11736] (ECF: Richard Gaal) [Entered: 07/21/2021 10:07 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketReceived paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. [Entered: 07/16/2021 03:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAppellant's brief filed by SE Property Holdings, LLC. [21-11736] (ECF: Richard Gaal) [Entered: 07/14/2021 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to SE Property Holdings, LLC. [Entered: 07/12/2021 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketOver the phone extension granted by clerk as to Attorney Richard M. Gaal for Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. Appellant's brief is due on 07/14/2021. [Entered: 06/25/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Clark R. Hammond for Neverve LLC. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page AND have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 06/21/2021 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 06/14/2021 12:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Richard M. Gaal for Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. [21-11736] (ECF: Richard Gaal) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Richard M. Gaal for Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. On the same day the CIP is served, any filer represented by counsel must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-1(b). [21-11736] (ECF: Richard Gaal) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard M. Gaal for SE Property Holdings, LLC. [21-11736] (ECF: Richard Gaal) [Entered: 06/04/2021 12:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC on 05/20/2021. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 06/30/2021. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/04/2021 as to Appellant SE Property Holdings, LLC. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/18/2021 as to Appellee Neverve LLC [Entered: 05/25/2021 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Neverve LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SE PROPERTY HOLDINGS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard M. Gaal