This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2021 at 06:27:06 (UTC).

Scott Spates v. Amimo Terry, et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Scott Spates filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Amimo Terry. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3190

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

JEAN KLABUNDE

AMIMO TERRY

Plaintiff / Appellant

SCOTT E. SPATES

Portage, WI 53901-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Scott E. Spates

Attorney at COLUMBIA CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION

2925 Columbia Drive, P.O. Box 900

Portage, WI 53901-0000

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 10 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 02/26/2021 for Scott E. Spates. SCR [11] [7132562] [20-3190] (FP) [Entered: 01/06/2021 09:59 AM]

#10

(#10) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Scott E. Spates for more time or to put the case on hold. [10] [7132189] [20-3190] (MAN) [Entered: 01/05/2021 11:14 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER re: 1) Motion to End Appeal on Case No. 20-3190. [ # 7 ] 2) Letter. Because it is unclear whether the appellant seeks to unconditionally dismiss this appeal, the motion to end appeal is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in a motion that makes such a request and complies with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). Any renewed motion is due by January 4, 2021. The appellant is reminded that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore the filing of a notice of appeal triggers the obligation to pay the $505.00 in filing fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Further, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/19/2021 for Scott E. Spates. CMD [9] [7129078] [20-3190]--[Edited 12/17/2020 by AD to reflect updated briefing.] (AD) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:30 PM]

#8

(#8) Filed letter from Appellant Scott E. Spates regarding filings. [8] [7128741] [20-3190] (MAN) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:22 PM]

#7

(#7) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Scott E. Spates to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [7] [7128558] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:35 AM]

#6

(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Scott E. Spates. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7128549] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:26 AM]

#5

(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Scott E. Spates. [5] [7128548] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:25 AM]

#4

(#4) ORDER: Appellant Scott E. Spates is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Scott E. Spates by 12/09/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 1711. [4] [7124017] [20-3190] (AD) [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:04 AM]

#3

(#3) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [3][7122024] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:15 PM]

#2

(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7120825] (Note: The Office of the WI Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [20-3190] (ER) [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:05 PM]

1 #4

PLRA Fee Notice DC

1 #3

Notice to District Court

1 #2

Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing

#1

Civil Rights Case

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order issued GRANTING motion to extend time to file appellant's brief. [ # 10 ] Appellant's brief due on or before 02/26/2021 for Scott E. Spates. SCR [11] [7132562] [20-3190] (FP) [Entered: 01/06/2021 09:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Scott E. Spates for more time or to put the case on hold. [10] [7132189] [20-3190] (MAN) [Entered: 01/05/2021 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re: 1) Motion to End Appeal on Case No. 20-3190. [ # 7 ] 2) Letter. Because it is unclear whether the appellant seeks to unconditionally dismiss this appeal, the motion to end appeal is DENIED without prejudice to renewal in a motion that makes such a request and complies with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 42(b). Any renewed motion is due by January 4, 2021. The appellant is reminded that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act and therefore the filing of a notice of appeal triggers the obligation to pay the $505.00 in filing fees. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Further, briefing will proceed as follows: Appellant's brief due on or before 01/19/2021 for Scott E. Spates. CMD [9] [7129078] [20-3190]--[Edited 12/17/2020 by AD to reflect updated briefing.] (AD) [Entered: 12/16/2020 03:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Filed letter from Appellant Scott E. Spates regarding filings. [8] [7128741] [20-3190] (MAN) [Entered: 12/15/2020 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pro se motion filed by Appellant Scott E. Spates to dismiss case pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [7] [7128558] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement filed by Appellant Scott E. Spates. Prior or Related proceedings: No. [6] [7128549] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Seventh Circuit Transcript Information Sheet by Appellant Scott E. Spates. [5] [7128548] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 12/15/2020 11:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Appellant Scott E. Spates is directed to file the overdue Docketing Statement within 14 days from the date of this Rule to Show Cause. Docketing statement response due for Appellant Scott E. Spates by 12/09/2020. Sent Certified Mail. Receipt Number: 7019 0700 0000 6008 1711. [4] [7124017] [20-3190] (AD) [Entered: 11/25/2020 09:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILED NOTICE FROM THE DISTRICT COURT THAT THE $505.00 APPELLATE FEE WAS RECEIVED. [3][7122024] [20-3190] (CM) [Entered: 11/16/2020 03:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) This is notification that no appellee(s) or counsel for the appellee(s) were served in the District Court. [2] [7120825] (Note: The Office of the WI Attorney General has been notified of the filing of the appeal.) [20-3190] (ER) [Entered: 11/10/2020 12:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) State prisoner's civil rights case docketed. IT IS ORDERED that this appeal is subject to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Proceedings are SUSPENDED pending notification by the district court that any necessary fee has been assessed, and if assessed, paid. PLRA Fee due. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Scott E. Spates by 11/17/2020. PLRA Fee/Motion/Memorandum due on 12/10/2020. Transcript information sheet due by 11/24/2020. [1] [7120816] [20-3190] (ER) [Entered: 11/10/2020 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less