This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/30/2020 at 06:37:44 (UTC).

Scott Gustafson v. Bi-State Development Agency

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 Scott Gustafson filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Bi-State Development Agency. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3046

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Scott Gustafson

Defendant / Appellee

Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District, doing business as Metro, doing business as Metro Transit, doing business as Metrobus, doing business as Metrolink

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Cyrus Dashtaki

Attorney at DASHTAKI LAW FIRM

5205 Hampton Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63109

Jason M. Finkes

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JASON M. FINKES

7542 York Drive

Clayton, MO 63105

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Brian C. Hey

Attorney at MCMAHON & BERGER

Suite 200, 2730 N. Ballas Road

Saint Louis, MO 63131-0000

James N. Foster Jr.

Attorney at MCMAHON & BERGER

Suite 200, 2730 N. Ballas Road

Saint Louis, MO 63131-0000

Rex Patrick Fennessey

Attorney at MCMAHON & BERGER

Suite 200, 2730 N. Ballas Road

Saint Louis, MO 63131-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document

CLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4974732-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Cyrus Dashtaki. Brief of Scott Gustafson due 12/21/2020. Appendix due on 12/21/2020. [4975156] [20-3046] (JPP) [Entered: 11/12/2020 04:03 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Cyrus Dashtaki for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson correcting [ # 4974732-2 ] motion filed by Attorney. [4974908] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:24 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/21/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Cyrus Dashtaki for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson w/service 11/10/2020. [4974732] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 11/10/2020 04:47 PM]

Open Document

STATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson - w/service 10/15/2020. [4966114] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:43 PM]

Open Document

METHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson - Separate Appendix - w/service 10/15/2020 [4966112] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:40 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Brian C. Hey for Appellee Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District w/service 10/02/2020 [4961961] [20-3046] (BCH) [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:02 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Jason M. Finkes for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson w/service 10/02/2020 [4961844] [20-3046] (JMF) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:50 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Cyrus Dashtaki for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson w/service 10/02/2020 [4961822] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:23 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by Rex P. Fennessey for Appellee Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District w/service 10/02/2020 [4961815] [20-3046] (RPF) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:16 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE filed by James N. Foster, Jr. for Appellee Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District w/service 10/02/2020 [4961806] [20-3046] (JNF) [Entered: 10/02/2020 09:56 AM]

Open Document

BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/10/2020. Appendix due 11/20/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Scott Gustafson due 11/20/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4961687] [20-3046] (CMH) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:37 PM]

Open Document

Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 8/7/2020. [4961684] [20-3046] (CMH) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:29 PM]

Open Document

Civil case docketed. [4961673] [20-3046] (CMH) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:23 PM]

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK ORDER:Granting [ # 4974732-2 ] motion for extension of time to file brief filed by Mr. Cyrus Dashtaki. Brief of Scott Gustafson due 12/21/2020. Appendix due on 12/21/2020. [4975156] [20-3046] (JPP) [Entered: 11/12/2020 04:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE filed by Attorney Mr. Cyrus Dashtaki for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson correcting [ # 4974732-2 ] motion filed by Attorney. [4974908] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 11/12/2020 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketOn December 1, 2016, the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure were amended to require a certificate of compliance for motions/petitions filed under [Rule 27/Rule 5/Rule 21/Rule 35/Rule 40], certifying that the document complies with the type-volume limitations and stating the number of words in the document. Your recently filed motion/petition did not contain this certificate of compliance. No action will be taken on your motion for extension of time to file brief, [ # 4974732-2 ], submitted by Mr. Cyrus Dashtaki in 20-3046 , pending the filing of a certificate of compliance using the 'Certificate of Compliance' event. Please do not refile your motion [20-3046] (JPP) [Entered: 11/12/2020 09:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION for extension of time to file brief until 12/21/2020, filed by Attorney Mr. Cyrus Dashtaki for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson w/service 11/10/2020. [4974732] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 11/10/2020 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT of issues filed by Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson - w/service 10/15/2020. [4966114] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson - Separate Appendix - w/service 10/15/2020 [4966112] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 10/15/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Brian C. Hey for Appellee Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District w/service 10/02/2020 [4961961] [20-3046] (BCH) [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Jason M. Finkes for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson w/service 10/02/2020 [4961844] [20-3046] (JMF) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Cyrus Dashtaki for Appellant Mr. Scott Gustafson w/service 10/02/2020 [4961822] [20-3046] (CD) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by Rex P. Fennessey for Appellee Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District w/service 10/02/2020 [4961815] [20-3046] (RPF) [Entered: 10/02/2020 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE filed by James N. Foster, Jr. for Appellee Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District w/service 10/02/2020 [4961806] [20-3046] (JNF) [Entered: 10/02/2020 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS: Transcript due on or before 11/10/2020. Appendix due 11/20/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Scott Gustafson due 11/20/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4961687] [20-3046] (CMH) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order and Judgment both dated 8/7/2020. [4961684] [20-3046] (CMH) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4961673] [20-3046] (CMH) [Entered: 10/01/2020 04:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri Illinois Metropolitan District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian C. Hey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex P. Fennessey