This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:02:37 (UTC).

Scott, et al v. Regalado, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Scott filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Regalado. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5068

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

SCOTT STREETER, individually

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS OF TULSA COUNTY, in their official capacities

Defendant / Appellees

VIC REGALADO, Sheriff of Tulsa County, in his official capacity

DEPUTY SHERIFF MARK FACEY, individually

DEPUTY SHERIFF JOSHUA VICTORY, individually

DEPUTY SHERIFF JAMISON HIRSCH, individually

Plaintiff / Appellants

MELISSA HAWTHORNE

SHAWN SCOTT, AKA Scott Jordan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Scott B. Wood Esq.

Attorney at Wood, Puhl & Wood

2409 East Skelly Drive, Suite 200

Tulsa, OK 74105

Douglas A. Wilson

Attorney at Tulsa County District Attorney

500 South Denver Avenue, Suite 900

Tulsa, OK 74103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Stanley D. Monroe

Attorney at Monroe & Keele

15 West 6Th Street, Suite 2112

Tulsa, OK 74119

Ann E. Keele

Attorney at Monroe & Keele

15 West 6Th Street, Suite 2112

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document

[10666085] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott B. Wood for Mr. Vic Regalado, Mr. Joshua Victory and Mr. Mark Facey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:15 PM]

Open Document #1

Preliminary Record

Open Document

[10665572] Notice received from Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5068] SDM [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:35 AM]

Open Document

[10666007] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/26/2019. Appellants brief and appendix due on 09/04/2019 for Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:51 AM]

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

[10665899] Entry of appearance filed by Scott B. Wood, Esq. for Jamison Hirsch. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:49 PM]

Open Document

[10666009] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/26/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/04/2019 for Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:53 AM]

Open Document

[10664701] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stanley D. Monroe for Shawn Scott and Melissa Hawthorne. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:44 AM]

Open Document

[10671644] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 10/04/2019 for Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. [19-5068] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:00 AM]

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

[10666266] Docketing statement filed by Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] SDM [Entered: 07/29/2019 07:38 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10671644] On the court's own motion and pursuant to 10th Cir. R. 33.1, order filed by (CLK) extending time to file appellants' brief and appendix until 10/04/2019 for Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. [19-5068] [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10667836] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 08/12/2019 at 10:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [19-5068] [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666266] Docketing statement filed by Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. Served on 07/29/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] SDM [Entered: 07/29/2019 07:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666085] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Scott B. Wood for Mr. Vic Regalado, Mr. Joshua Victory and Mr. Mark Facey. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/26/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • [10666077] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott Boudinot Wood for Appellees Mark Facey, Mr. Vic Regalado and Joshua Victory for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/26/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068]--[Edited 07/26/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SBW [Entered: 07/26/2019 11:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666009] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/26/2019. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 09/04/2019 for Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666007] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 07/26/2019. Appellants brief and appendix due on 09/04/2019 for Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665899] Entry of appearance filed by Scott B. Wood, Esq. for Jamison Hirsch. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/25/2019 03:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • [10665766] Entry of appearance submitted by Scott Boudinot Wood for Appellees Mark Facey, Jamison Hirsch, Mr. Vic Regalado, Joshua Victory and Not Parties Scott Streeter and Board of County Commissioners of Tulsa County for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] --[Edited 07/25/2019 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] SBW [Entered: 07/25/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • [10665596] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 08/01/2019 for Mark C. McCartt, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-5068] [Entered: 07/25/2019 08:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665572] Notice received from Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott that a transcript is not necessary for this appeal. Served on: 07/25/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-5068] SDM [Entered: 07/25/2019 07:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • This entry has been removed from the docket. [KLP] Already submitted and filed. [10665002] Entry of appearance submitted by Stanley D. Monroe for Appellants Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/23/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] SDM [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10664701] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stanley D. Monroe for Shawn Scott and Melissa Hawthorne. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068] [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • [10664685] Entry of appearance submitted by Stanley D. Monroe for Appellants Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/22/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-5068]--[Edited 07/22/2019 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] SDM [Entered: 07/22/2019 09:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663544] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/16/2019 Docketing statement and transcript order form due 07/30/2019 for Melissa Hawthorne and Shawn Scott. Notice of appearance due on 07/30/2019 for Mark Facey, Melissa Hawthorne, Jamison Hirsch, Vic Regalado, Shawn Scott and Joshua Victory [19-5068] [Entered: 07/16/2019 03:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.