This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/18/2020 at 06:07:35 (UTC).

Scott C., et al v. Riverview Gardens School Dist., et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 Scott C filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Riverview Gardens School Dist . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eighth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-3177

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Metropolitan Congregations United

Empower Missouri

Defendants

Gavin Allan, in his official capacity as Director of DESE's Civil Rights Compliance

Charles W. Shields, in their official capacities as Members of the Missouri State Board of Education

Missouri Department of Elementary and Secondary Education, (DESE)

Andrea Woods, in her official capacity as Riverview Gardens Homeless Coordinator

Chaketa Riddle

Lynn Beckwith, Jr.

Carol Hallquist

Roger Dorson, in his official capacity as Interim Commissioner of Education

O. Victor Lenz, Jr.

State Board of Education

Peter F. Herschend

Donna Cash, in her official capacity as Homeless State Coordinator for DESE

Michael W. Jones

Mark Tranel, in their official capacities as Members of the Special Administrative Board

Veronica Morrow-Reel

Defendant / Appellant

Riverview Gardens School District

Plaintiff / Appellees

Rio M., Next Friend for minor Miles M.

Scott C., by and through Next Friend, Melissa C.

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Michelle H. Basi

Attorney at TUETH & KEENEY

Suite 600, 34 N. Meramec

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

James Robert Layton

Attorney at TUETH & KEENEY

Suite 600, 34 N. Meramec

Saint Louis, MO 63105

Melanie Gurley Keeney

Attorney at TUETH & KEENEY

Suite 600, 34 N. Meramec

Saint Louis, MO 63105-0000

Adam Crismon Henningsen

Attorney at TUETH & KEENEY

Suite 210, 101 W. Vandalia

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Joel David Ferber

Attorney at LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI

4232 Forest Park Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63108

Daniel M. Meyers

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

Suite 4200, 70 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Lisa Joy D'Souza

Attorney at LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI

4232 Forest Park Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63108

Amanda Jean Schneider

Attorney at LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI

4232 Forest Park Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63108

Caitlin Martini Mika

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER

Suite 4200, 70 W. Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Mark D. Rosenbaum

610 S. Ardmore Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90005

Elizabeth Hope Fink

Attorney at LEGAL SERVICES OF EASTERN MISSOURI

4232 Forest Park Avenue

Saint Louis, MO 63108

Amanda Roman Mangaser Savage

610 S. Ardmore Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90005

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Letter From Clerk's Office

Open Document #2

Briefing Schedule

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATE ISSUED. [4980779] [20-3177] (AMT) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED - The parties have filed a stipulation for dismissal. [ # 4980633-2 ] The case is dismissed in accordance with Rule 42(b), Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Mandate shall issue forthwith. [4980772] [20-3177] (AMT) [Entered: 12/01/2020 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION for dismissal filed by Appellants Riverview Gardens School District, Special Administrative Board and Appellees Mr. Miles M., Ms. Melissa C. and Mr. Scott C.. w/service 12/01/2020 [4980633] [20-3177] (JRL) [Entered: 12/01/2020 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of transcript filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Dorson in 20-3077. Transcript ordered on September 11, 2020. [4967574] [20-3077, 20-3177] (JAO) [Entered: 10/20/2020 02:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMETHOD of appendix preparation filed by Appellant Mr. Roger Dorson in 20-3077 - Joint Appendix - w/service 10/20/2020 [4967564] [20-3077, 20-3177] (JAO) [Entered: 10/20/2020 02:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREVISED BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET Case no. 20-3077 Scott C., et al v. Missouri Dept. of Elementary & Secondary Education, et al. and case no. 20-3177 Scott C. et al. v. Riverview Gardens School District, et al., have been consolidated for briefing and submission. The following revised briefing schedule supersedes any previously-issued schedules. Transcript due on or before 11/30/2020. Appendix due 12/10/2020. BRIEF APPELLANT, Roger Dorson, Missouri Department of Elementary and Secondary Education, Riverview Gardens School District and Special Administrative Board due 12/10/2020 Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant. [4966846] [20-3077, 20-3177] (CAH) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, order 9/3/20, judgment 9/4/20. [4966838] [20-3177] (CAH) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil case docketed. [4966833] [20-3177] (CAH) [Entered: 10/19/2020 11:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Riverview Gardens School District is a litigant

Latest cases where Missouri Department of Elementary and Secondary Education is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EDUCATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amanda J. Schneider