This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:02:44 (UTC).

Schuyler Speece v. Unknown

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Schuyler Speece filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Unknown. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7023

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

UNKNOWN

LIEUTENANT HACKETT, Lieutenant

BRITTANY HARRIS, MSN, FNP-C

JAMES C. WILLETT, Col./Superintendent

Plaintiff / Appellant

SCHUYLER A. SPEECE

Hanover, VA 23069-0000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Schuyler A. Speece

Attorney at NOTTOWAY CORRECTIONAL CENTER

P. O. Box 485

Hanover, VA 23069-0000

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00483-LMB-TCB. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:50 PM]

#12

(#12) ORDER filed [1000575262] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 11 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:49 PM]

#11

(#11) MOTION by Schuyler A. Speece to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [11]. [1000575257] [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:47 PM]

#10

(#10) CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Schuyler A. Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:23 PM]

9 #2

Informal Brief

9 #1

Rule 45

8 #2

(#8) Returned mail received from Schuyler A. Speece re [ # 6 ] order. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? remailed to new address [1000558809] [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:44 PM]

8 #1

Returned mail received

#7

(#7) CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Schuyler A. Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:43 PM]

#6

(#6) ORDER filed [1000554018] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Schuyler Speece # 1425032 Pamunkey Regional Jail P.O. Box 485 Hanover, VA 23069-0000. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece and PLRA Custodian. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:00 PM]

#3

(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:57 AM]

#2

(#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Schuyler A. Speece ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:54 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00483-LMB-TCB. Case manager: REdwards. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:52 AM]

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00483-LMB-TCB. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER filed [1000575262] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 11 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION by Schuyler A. Speece to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [11]. [1000575257] [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Schuyler A. Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 45 NOTICE issued to Schuyler A. Speece re: for failure to satisfy informal briefing requirements. Case will be dismissed if default is not cured within 15 days. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/27/2019 09:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Returned mail received from Schuyler A. Speece re [ # 6 ] order. What action was taken to correct address and re-serve document? remailed to new address [1000558809] [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CHANGE OF ADDRESS Notice by Schuyler A. Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 08/01/2019 02:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER filed [1000554018] granting Motion for leave to proceed PLRA [5] Fee Amount: $505. Name and Prisoner Number: Schuyler Speece # 1425032 Pamunkey Regional Jail P.O. Box 485 Hanover, VA 23069-0000. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece and PLRA Custodian. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • (#5) PLRA-APPLICATION (court access only) by Schuyler A. Speece. Consent to Payment Form: Yes; Trust Account Statement: No. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/25/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00483-LMB-TCB. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. Informal Opening Brief due 08/08/2019. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PLRA NOTICE issued to [ Schuyler A. Speece ]. Fee due to District Court or PLRA application due to Court of Appeals within 15 days. Mailed to: Schuyler Speece. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:19-cv-00483-LMB-TCB. Case manager: REdwards. [19-7023] RE [Entered: 07/15/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.