This case was last updated from PACER on 05/26/2019 at 06:05:34 (UTC).

Savage v. Dugal

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 Savage filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Dugal. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1301

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant

BOSTON, MA

Defendant / Appellant

KARL DUGAL

Plaintiff / Appellee

GEORGE SAVAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Katherine Nowland Galle

Attorney at Haug Partners

1 Post Office Sq, 31St Fl

Boston, MA 02109

Erika Paula Reis

Attorney at City of Boston Law Department

1 City Hall Square, Rm 615

Boston, MA 02201-0000

Matthew Michael McGarry

Attorney at City of Boston Law Department

1 City Hall Square, Rm 615

Boston, MA 02201-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Patrick Michael Groulx

Attorney at Isenberg Groulx LLP

368 W Broadway, Ste 2

Boston, MA 02127

Justin L. Drechsler

Attorney at The Law Offices of Justin Drechsler, PC

Po Box 1390

Montpelier, VT 05601

 

Court Documents

Open Document

NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Justin L. Drechsler for George Savage. [19-1301] (MH) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:38 AM]

Open Document #2

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Karl Dugal filed by Attorney Erika P. Reis. Certificate of service dated 04/18/2019. [19-1301] (EPR) [Entered: 04/18/2019 01:39 PM]

Open Document #1

Notice of Appearance

Open Document

NOTICE issued. After 04/25/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Justin L. Drechsler for George Savage. [19-1301] (MH) [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:10 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATION of filing transcript filed by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [19-1301]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GRC) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:17 PM]

Open Document #2

Transcript Acknowledgment

Open Document #1

Transcript Report/Order Form

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Karl Dugal indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1301] (MMM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:03 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Karl Dugal. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1301] (MMM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:37 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Karl Dugal filed by Attorney Matthew M. McGarry. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1301] (MMM) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:56 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee George Savage filed by Attorney Patrick M. Groulx. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1301] (PMG) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:14 PM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Justin L. Drechsler for George Savage. [19-1301] (MH) [Entered: 04/26/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Karl Dugal filed by Attorney Erika P. Reis. Certificate of service dated 04/18/2019. [19-1301] (EPR) [Entered: 04/18/2019 01:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE issued. After 04/25/2019, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Justin L. Drechsler for George Savage. [19-1301] (MH) [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow: 02/04/2019, Jury Voir Dire. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [19-1301] (MH) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATION of filing transcript filed by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [19-1301]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GRC) [Entered: 04/09/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Karl Dugal indicating the following transcript is being ordered: 02/04/2019, Jury Voir Dire. Transcript due 05/28/2019 from Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow. [19-1301] (MH) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Karl Dugal indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1301] (MMM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 11:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Karl Dugal. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1301] (MMM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Karl Dugal filed by Attorney Matthew M. McGarry. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1301] (MMM) [Entered: 03/27/2019 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee George Savage filed by Attorney Patrick M. Groulx. Certificate of service dated 03/27/2019. [19-1301] (PMG) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #83) filed by Appellant Karl Dugal. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 04/10/2019. [19-1301] (MH) [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less