This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/06/2020 at 06:08:29 (UTC).

Sault Ste. Marie Tribe of Chip v. David Bernhardt, et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2020 Sault Ste Marie Tribe of Chip filed an Other lawsuit against David Bernhardt. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-5123

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellees

MGM Grand Detroit, LLC

Greektown Casino, LLC

Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan

Nottawaseppi Huron Band of Potawatomi Indians

Detroit Entertainment, LLC

Defendant / Appellants

David Longly Bernhardt, in his official capacity as Secretary of the Interior

United States Department of the Interior

Plaintiff / Appellee

Sault Ste. Marie Tribe of Chippewa Indians

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Michael Anthony Carvin

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

William Dennis Coglianese

Attorney at Jones Day

51 Louisiana Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20001-2113

Zachary C. Schauf

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

Ian Heath Gershengorn

Attorney at Jenner & Block LLP

1099 New York Avenue, Nw, Suite 900

Washington, DC 20001-4412

William Arthur Szotkowski

Attorney at Hogen Adams, PLLC

1935 W. County Road B2, Suite 460

St. Paul, MN 55113

Leah Jurss

Attorney at Hogen Adams, PLLC

1935 W. County Road B2, Suite 460

St. Paul, MN 55113

Merrill C. Godfrey

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Pratik Arvind Shah

Attorney at Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Robert S. Strauss Tower, 2001 K Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

DOJ Appellate Counsel

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Erika Kranz

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

Po Box 7415, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044-7415

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kevin Matthew Lamb

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Arpit Kumar Garg

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Danielle Spinelli

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

Kelly Patrick Dunbar

Attorney at Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP

1875 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20006-1420

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Exhibit B - Memorandum Opinion

Open Document #2

Exhibit A - Order

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1846880] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI in 20-5123 [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 06/11/2020 05:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1846878] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-5123] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 06/11/2020 05:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1846874] submitted by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] [20-5123] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 06/11/2020 05:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1846871] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] [20-5123] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 06/11/2020 05:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1846870] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] [20-5123] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 06/11/2020 05:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1846867] filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] [20-5123] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 06/11/2020 04:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE [1846856] to record [ # 1846855-2 ], report status of transcript (final) [ # 1846854-2 ], statement [ # 1846852-2 ], statement [ # 1846851-2 ], statement [ # 1846849-2 ], certificate [ # 1846847-2 ] filed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan in 20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128. [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] (Szotkowski, William) [Entered: 06/11/2020 04:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1846855] submitted by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan in 20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128 [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] (Szotkowski, William) [Entered: 06/11/2020 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1846854] filed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan in 20-5127 [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - All transcripts needed for the appeal have been completed and received. [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] (Szotkowski, William) [Entered: 06/11/2020 04:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1846852] filed by Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan in 20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128 [Service Date: 06/11/2020 ] [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] (Szotkowski, William) [Entered: 06/11/2020 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1842447] filed by Danielle Spinelli and co-counsel Arpit K. Garg, Kevin M. Lamb on behalf of Appellee Sault Ste. Marie Tribe of Chippewa Indians in 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128. [20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] (Spinelli, Danielle) [Entered: 05/12/2020 03:02 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1842334] filed consolidating cases; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/11/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/26/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/11/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/11/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/11/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/26/2020 [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] [Entered: 05/12/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1842311] filed vacating 5/8/20 Clerk order [ # 1841964-2 ] [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128] [Entered: 05/12/2020 09:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1842251] filed by Michael A. Carvin and co-counsel William D. Coglianese on behalf of Appellants Detroit Entertainment, LLC, Greektown Casino, LLC and MGM Grand Detroit, LLC in 20-5125. [20-5125, 20-5123, 20-5127, 20-5128] (Coglianese, William) [Entered: 05/11/2020 04:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1842007] filed by Pratik A. Shah and co-counsel Merrill C. Godfrey on behalf of Appellant Nottawaseppi Huron Band of Potawatomi Indians in 20-5128, Appellee Nottawaseppi Huron Band of Potawatomi Indians in 20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127. [20-5128, 20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127] (Godfrey, Merrill) [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1841976] filed by Erika B. Kranz on behalf of Appellants Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI in 20-5123, Appellee Mr. David Longly Bernhardt in 20-5125, 20-5128, 20-5127. [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5128, 20-5127] (Kranz, Erika) [Entered: 05/08/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[VACATED BY ORDER OF 5/12/20] CLERK'S ORDER [1841964] filed consolidating cases 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128 (Cross-appeal started 05/08/2020) with 20-5123; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS docketing statement due 06/08/2020. APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS certificate as to parties due 06/08/2020. APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS statement of issues due 06/08/2020. APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS underlying decision due 06/08/2020.APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS deferred appendix statement due 06/08/2020. APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS entry of appearance due 06/08/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/08/2020. APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS procedural motions due 06/08/2020. APPELLANTS and CROSS-APPELLANTS dispositive motions due 06/22/2020 [20-5123, 20-5125, 20-5127, 20-5128]--[Edited 05/12/2020 by LMF] [Entered: 05/08/2020 01:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1841809] filed by Danielle Spinelli and co-counsel Arpit Garg, Kevin Lamb on behalf of Appellee Sault Ste. Marie Tribe of Chippewa Indians. [20-5123] (Lamb, Kevin) [Entered: 05/07/2020 06:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1841662] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:18-cv-02035-TNM filed by Mr. David Longly Bernhardt and DOI. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-5123. [20-5123] [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketUS CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-5123] [Entered: 05/07/2020 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sault Ste. Marie Tribe of Chippewa Indians is a litigant

Latest cases where Greektown Casino, LLC is a litigant