This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/08/2020 at 06:10:25 (UTC).

Sati Sen v. Wilmington Trust, NA, et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Sati Sen filed an Other lawsuit against Wilmington Trust, NA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1217

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals - Bankruptcy, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Appellant

SATI SANTOSHI SEN

Ceres, CA 95307

Debtor

In re: SATI SANTOSHI SEN

Appellees

SPS

WILMINGTON TRUST, NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Sati Santoshi Sen

1833 Darby Lane

Ceres, CA 95307

Appellee Attorney

Megan E. Lees Esquire

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

1230 Columbia Street

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) BAP MANDATE ISSUED. Notice of entry of judgment to parties, regional U.S. Trustee and Bankruptcy Clerk. (VB) [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:31 PM]

6 #2

Certificate of Mailing

6 #1

10/13/2020 BAP Order Dismissing Appeal

#5

(#5) Filed Party Sati Santoshi Sen's motion for extension of time to file response. no pos. (PI) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:46 PM]

#4

(#4) Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant RE: NOA filed beyond the 14 days allowed ( lack of jurisdiction). Response Due: 09/25/2020 . cc: All parties. (VJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:22 PM]

#3

(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Sati Santoshi Sen. Copies to all parties. Appellant Sati Santoshi Sen's opening brief due 10/26/2020 (VJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:12 PM]

#2

Bankruptcy Court Notice Form

2 #1

Opening Letter

#1

(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/01/2020, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 09/09/2020 01:05 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) BAP MANDATE ISSUED. Notice of entry of judgment to parties, regional U.S. Trustee and Bankruptcy Clerk. (VB) [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • Docket(#7) CLOSED: Case closed: Jurisdictional Defect; Procedural termination after other judicial action; Faris, Spraker and Brand; 10/13/2020; EC-20-1217; Judges order. (VB) [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF DISMISSAL (Faris, Spraker and Brand); This appeal is ORDERED DISMISSED as untimely. [EOD] Date: 10/13/1217. (VB) [Entered: 10/13/2020 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed Party Sati Santoshi Sen's motion for extension of time to file response. no pos. (PI) [Entered: 10/01/2020 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Deficiency sent to Appellant RE: NOA filed beyond the 14 days allowed ( lack of jurisdiction). Response Due: 09/25/2020 . cc: All parties. (VJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Sent BRIEFING ORDER & NOTICE to appellant Sati Santoshi Sen. Copies to all parties. Appellant Sati Santoshi Sen's opening brief due 10/26/2020 (VJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to all parties and Bankruptcy Court RE: BAP Case number assigned: EC-20-1217. Sent Bankruptcy Record Request Form to Bankruptcy Court. (VJ) [Entered: 09/11/2020 01:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Received notice of appeal filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/01/2020, notice of referral, transmittal form. (VJ) [Entered: 09/09/2020 01:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPS is a litigant

Latest cases where WILMINGTON TRUST, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY, BUT SOLELY AS TRUSTEE FOR MFRA TRUST 2015-1 is a litigant