This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/09/2022 at 06:00:34 (UTC).

Sarno Realty, Inc., et al v. Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast

Case Summary

On 04/10/2022 Sarno Realty, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Selective Insurance Company of the Southeast. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-1247

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

SARNO REALTY, INC., a/k/a Sarno Realty

MASS CABINETS, INC.

NORTHEASTERN SCALE LUMBER COMPANY, INC., a/k/a Northeastern Scale Lumber Company

Defendant / Appellee

SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, of the Southeast

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Tyler O. Casey

Attorney at Regnante Sterio LLP

401 Edgewater Pl, Ste 630

Wakefield, MA 01880-6210

Seth H. Hochbaum

Attorney at Regnante Sterio LLP

401 Edgewater Pl, Ste 630

Wakefield, MA 01880-6210

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Kyle Espinola

Attorney at Zelle LLP

161 Worcester Rd, Ste 502

Framingham, MA 01701

Jeffrey A. Gordon

Attorney at Zelle LLP

161 Worcester Rd, Ste 502

Framingham, MA 01701

Seth V. Jackson

Attorney at Zelle LLP

161 Worcester Rd, Ste 502

Framingham, MA 01701

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Selective Insurance Company. Brief due 07/18/2022 for appellee Selective Insurance Company. [22-1247] (ALW) [Entered: 06/02/2022 06:00 PM]

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Selective Insurance Company. Served on 06/01/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (SVJ) [Entered: 06/01/2022 05:29 PM]

Open Document #6

Appendix - Vol. 6 of 6

Open Document #5

Appendix - Vol. 5 of 6

Open Document #4

Appendix - Vol. 4 of 6

Open Document #3

Appendix - Vol. 3 of 6

Open Document #2

Appendix - Vol. 2 of 6

Open Document #1

Appendix - Vol. 1 of 6

Open Document

DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. Served on 05/17/2022. [22-1247] (LIM) [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:25 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] (SHH) [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:26 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. filed by Attorney Seth H. Hochbaum. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, 04/13/2022. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:42 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. As document has been correctly refiled, no further action required. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:33 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. As document has been correctly refiled, no further action required. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:31 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. filed by Attorney Seth H. Hochbaum. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, 04/13/2022. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:28 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Sarno Realty, Inc. and Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. filed by Attorney Tyler O. Casey. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:27 AM]

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Selective Insurance Company. Brief due 07/18/2022 for appellee Selective Insurance Company. [22-1247] (ALW) [Entered: 06/02/2022 06:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee Selective Insurance Company. Served on 06/01/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (SVJ) [Entered: 06/01/2022 05:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketFIVE (5) paper copies of appendix [ # 6496634-2 ] submitted by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. [22-1247] (YCC) [Entered: 05/25/2022 03:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellants' brief [ # 6496618-2 ] submitted by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. [22-1247] (YCC) [Entered: 05/25/2022 02:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. Served on 05/17/2022. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/26/2022 [22-1247] (LIM) [Entered: 05/19/2022 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. Served on 05/17/2022. [22-1247] (LIM) [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:25 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. Served on 05/17/2022. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 05/26/2022 . Brief due 06/16/2022 for APPELLEE Selective Insurance Company. [22-1247] (LIM) [Entered: 05/19/2022 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPENDIX tendered by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Sarno Realty, Inc. and Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc.. Served on 05/17/2022. [22-1247] (SHH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. [22-1247] (SHH) [Entered: 05/17/2022 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Jeffrey A. Gordon for Selective Insurance Company. [22-1247] (ALW) [Entered: 04/20/2022 01:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. filed by Attorney Seth H. Hochbaum. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] (SHH) [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. filed by Attorney Seth H. Hochbaum. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] (SHH) [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] (SHH) [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] (SHH) [Entered: 04/11/2022 11:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. filed by Attorney Seth H. Hochbaum. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, 04/13/2022. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 10:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. As document has been correctly refiled, no further action required. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. As document has been correctly refiled, no further action required. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:31 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc. filed by Attorney Seth H. Hochbaum. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, 04/13/2022. (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Sarno Realty, Inc. and Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. filed by Attorney Tyler O. Casey. Served on 04/11/2022. [22-1247] (TOC) [Entered: 04/11/2022 09:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #58) filed by Appellants Mass Cabinets, Inc., Northeastern Scale Lumber Company, Inc. and Sarno Realty, Inc.. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 04/25/2022. [22-1247] (ALW) [Entered: 04/11/2022 12:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Selective Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seth V Jackson