This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/25/2021 at 06:04:31 (UTC).

Sapphire Enterprises, LLC v. Allstate Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Sapphire Enterprises, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1325

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SAPPHIRE ENTERPRISES, LLC, d/b/a As Seen on TV Plus, d/b/a As Seen on TV, Madisyn Jecha, by and through its assignee Madisyn Jecha

Defendant / Appellee

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Charles J. Baker III

Attorney at WOMBLE BOND DICKINSON (US) LLP

P. O. Box 999

Charleston, SC 29402-0000

Christopher Joseph McCool

Attorney at JOYE LAW FIRM

5861 Rivers Avenue

North Charleston, SC 29406-0000

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Alfred Johnston Cox

Attorney at GALLIVAN, WHITE & BOYD, PA

P. O. Box 7368

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

#11

(#11) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/01/2021. Response brief due 07/01/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000941180] [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 04/27/2021 12:14 PM]

#10

(#10) Mediation conference data modified. [21-1325] MRB [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:44 AM]

#9

(#9) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-1325] MRB [Entered: 04/09/2021 08:15 AM]

#8

(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sapphire Enterprises, LLC. [21-1325] Charles Baker [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:50 PM]

#7

(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sapphire Enterprises, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000930867] [21-1325] Charles Baker [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:49 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles J Baker III for Sapphire Enterprises, LLC. [1000930863] [21-1325] Charles Baker [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:47 PM]

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000924485] [21-1325] Alfred Cox [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:19 AM]

#4

(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. Johnston Cox for Allstate Insurance Company. [1000924482] [21-1325] Alfred Cox [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:18 AM]

#3

(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Christopher McCool. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/05/2021. Response Brief due 06/04/2021. [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:14 AM]

#2

(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-01054-MBS. Mailed to: Christopher McCool. [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:11 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-01054-MBS. Case manager: Rachel Lee. [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 03/26/2021 09:54 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMediation forms. [21-1325] MRB [Entered: 05/06/2021 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER filed extending briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/01/2021. Response brief due 07/01/2021. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Copies to all parties. [1000941180] [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 04/27/2021 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Mediation conference data modified. [21-1325] MRB [Entered: 04/27/2021 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Initial mediation conference scheduled. [21-1325] MRB [Entered: 04/09/2021 08:15 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKETING STATEMENT by Sapphire Enterprises, LLC. [21-1325] Charles Baker [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sapphire Enterprises, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000930867] [21-1325] Charles Baker [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Charles J Baker III for Sapphire Enterprises, LLC. [1000930863] [21-1325] Charles Baker [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Insurance Company. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000924485] [21-1325] Alfred Cox [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by A. Johnston Cox for Allstate Insurance Company. [1000924482] [21-1325] Alfred Cox [Entered: 03/29/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Christopher McCool. Paper copy requirements are temporarily suspended unless the case is under pre-argument review or being scheduled for argument, in which case a total of four paper copies of formal briefs and appendices are required. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/05/2021. Response Brief due 06/04/2021. [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-01054-MBS. Mailed to: Christopher McCool. [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:20-cv-01054-MBS. Case manager: Rachel Lee. [21-1325] RJL [Entered: 03/26/2021 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alfred Johnston Cox