This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:19 (UTC).

Santorelli v. Town Of Islip

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Santorelli filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Town Of Islip. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2153

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

Tracey Krut, as Chief of Staff

Jason Mistretta, as Chief Inspector of Code Enforcement

Thomas Owens, as Commissioner of Department of Public Works

Anthony D'Amico, as Islip Town Safety Commissioner

Town of Islip

John Doe No. 2

Angie M. Carpenter, as Town of Islip Supervisor

John Doe No. 1

Plaintiff / Appellant

Thomas Santorelli

Bay Shore, NY 11706

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

William D. Wexler Esq.

Attorney at Law Office of William D. Wexler, Esq.

816 Deer Park Avenue

North Babylon, NY 11703

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Thomas Santorelli

102 North Park Avenue

Bay Shore, NY 11706

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [12], on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623240] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:13 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 08/01/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/22/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits Acknoweldgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2622707] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:01 PM]

#7

(#7) ORDER, dated 07/30/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/20/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620777] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:53 PM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2610773] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:45 PM]

#17

(#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to withdraw appeal, [16], on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2629015] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:37 PM]

#11

(#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknolwedgment and Notice of Appearance, [10], on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623033] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:08 AM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

1 #2

Case FILED

14 #2

Supporting Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE, to Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2622529] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:16 PM]

#5

(#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2610785] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:51 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

#6

(#6) ORDER, dated 07/30/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/20/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620776] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:47 PM]

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 06/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2610772] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:45 PM]

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to withdraw appeal, [16], on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2629015] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • (#16) MOTION, to withdraw appeal, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2629011] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/09/2019 03:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 13 ], [ # 14 ], on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED.[2624280] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/05/2019 02:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2624239] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/05/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [12], on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623240] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • (#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2623145] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknolwedgment and Notice of Appearance, [10], on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2623033] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • (#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip, FILED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2622976] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 08/01/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/22/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits Acknoweldgment and Notice of Appearance, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2622707] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/01/2019 06:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE, to Appellee Angie M. Carpenter, Anthony D'Amico, John Doe No. 1, John Doe No. 2, Tracey Krut, Jason Mistretta, Thomas Owens and Town of Islip , for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2622529] [19-2153] [Entered: 08/01/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER, dated 07/30/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/20/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620777] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER, dated 07/30/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/20/2019, unless Appellant Thomas Santorelli, submits fee or moves for in forma pauperis, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2620776] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/30/2019 05:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2610785] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2610776] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/25/2019, RECEIVED.[2610773] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 06/21/2019, RECEIVED.[2610772] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Thomas Santorelli, FILED. [2610769] [19-2153] [Entered: 07/17/2019 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.