This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/15/2021 at 06:10:04 (UTC).

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. v. Mylan, et al

Case Summary

On 01/14/2021 Sanofi-Aventis U S filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Mylan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-3005

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

 

Party Details

Appellant

SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S., LLC

Counter Claimant

MYLAN SPECIALTY, LP

Defendant / Appellee

MYLAN, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Erin Marie James

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges

767 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3301

New York, NY 10153

Paul J. Geller

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

120 East Palmetto Park Road, Suite 500

Boca Raton, FL 33432-4809

Melissa Rutman

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges

767 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3301

New York, NY 10153

Adam Scott Tolin

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges

17 Hulfish Street, Suite 201

Princeton, NJ 08542

Joseph Adamson

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges

767 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3301

New York, NY 10153

Luna Ngan Barrington

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges

767 Fifth Avenue, Suite 3301

New York, NY 10153

Nathaniel David White

Attorney at Weil Gotshal & Manges

200 Crescent Court, Suite 300

Dallas, TX 75201

Counter Claimant and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Ralph C. Mayrell

Attorney at Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber

2000 K Street, Nw, 4Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Benjamin Frederick Holt

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Elizabeth Lockwood

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Katherine Booth Wellington

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

James Moloney

Attorney at Lathrop GPM

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64108-2612

Brian Christopher Fries

Attorney at Lathrop GPM

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64108-2612

Kathryn Marshall Ali

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Roy T. Englert Jr.

Attorney at Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber

2000 K Street, Nw, 4Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006-0000

John Goerlich

Attorney at Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber

2000 K Street, Nw, 4Th Floor

Washington, DC 20006-0000

Chad E. Blomberg

Attorney at Lathrop GPM

2345 Grand Boulevard, Suite 2200

Kansas City, MO 64108-2612

Carolyn Anne DeLone

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Christine A. Sifferman

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Kimberly Rancour

Attorney at Hogan Lovells

555 Thirteenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #1

Preliminary record

Open Restricted Document #2

Transmittal letter

Open Restricted Document #3

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Mediation Conference Notice

Open Document #2

Mediation Contact Form

Open Document

Open Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10808031] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting the parties' joint motion for briefing schedule. Appellant's brief and appendix is due on 05/28/2021 for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. Appellees' brief shall be filed on 09/15/2021. The reply brief shall be filed on 10/22/2021. Further modification to the briefing schedule is discouraged. Served on 02/16/2021. [21-3005] [Entered: 02/16/2021 03:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10807796] Motion filed by Appellant Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC, Defendants-Appellees Mylan, Inc. and Mylan Specialty, LP (collectively, Mylan) [Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule] to extend time to file appellant/petitioner's brief until 05/28/2021. Served on: 02/16/2021. Manner of service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-3005] GS [Entered: 02/16/2021 10:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803871] Notice of Mediation Conference filed by the Tenth Circuit Mediation Office. Telephone conference scheduled for 02/10/2021 at 9:00 am (MT). The mediation contact form must be completed and returned to the Mediation Office within four days of the date of this notice. [Please open the Notice for important information.] [21-3005] [Entered: 01/29/2021 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803501] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 01/28/2021. Appellant's brief and appendix due on 03/09/2021 for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. [21-3005] [Entered: 01/28/2021 10:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803483] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Lee Turner Friedman and Mr. Ralph C. Mayrell for Mylan, Inc., and Mylan Specialty, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] [Entered: 01/28/2021 09:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803403] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Roy T. Englert, Jr. and Mr. Philip A. Sechler for Mylan, Inc. and Mylan Specialty, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] [Entered: 01/28/2021 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803387] Entry of appearance filed by Jessica Arden Ettinger and John Goerlich for Mylan, Inc. and Mylan Specialty, LP. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] [Entered: 01/28/2021 07:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket[10803357] Entry of appearance submitted by Jessica Arden Ettinger and John B. Goerlich for Appellees Mylan Specialty, LP and Mylan, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] --[Edited 01/28/2021 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] JG [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket[10803356] Entry of appearance submitted by Lee Turner Friedman and Ralph C. Mayrell for Appellees Mylan Specialty, LP and Mylan, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005]--[Edited 01/28/2021 by KLP to delete the attachment; entry filed.] LTF [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • Docket[10803355] Entry of appearance submitted by Philip A. Sechler and Roy T. Englert, Jr. for Appellees Mylan Specialty, LP and Mylan, Inc. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/28/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005]--[Edited 01/28/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/28/21.] PAS [Entered: 01/28/2021 06:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803321] Entry of appearance filed by Joshua Halpern for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y, more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket[10803231] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/03/2021 for Timothy M. O'Brien, Clerk of Court (oclk). (Text Only - No Attachment) [21-3005] [Entered: 01/27/2021 02:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket[10803230] Entry of appearance submitted by Joshua Halpern for Appellant Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005]--[Edited 01/27/2021 by JM PDF remvoed filed by the court on 1/27/21.] JH [Entered: 01/27/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803226] Notice filed that the transcript is already on file in the district court filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. Served on: 01/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] ESH [Entered: 01/27/2021 02:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803220] Docketing statement filed by Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. Served on 01/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] GS [Entered: 01/27/2021 01:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10803206] Entry of appearance filed by Gregory Silbert, Yehudah L. Buchweitz, and Eric S. Hochstadt for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y more than 50 parties. Served on 01/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005] [Entered: 01/27/2021 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • Docket[10803165] Entry of appearance submitted by Gregory Silbert, Yehudah L. Buchweitz, and Eric S. Hochstadt for Appellant Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 01/27/2021. Manner of Service: email. [21-3005]--[Edited 01/27/2021 by JM PDF removed filed by the court on 1/27/21] GS [Entered: 01/27/2021 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10799958] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 01/13/2020. Docketing statement due 01/28/2021 for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. Transcript order form due 01/28/2021 for Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. Notice of appearance due on 01/28/2021 for Mylan Specialty, LP, Mylan, Inc. and Sanofi-Aventis U.S., LLC. [21-3005] [Entered: 01/14/2021 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mylan Specialty, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where MYLAN INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Scott Tolin