This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2021 at 06:08:44 (UTC).

Sandy v. Baca Grande Property, et al

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 Sandy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Baca Grande Property. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1413

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

CONNIE ESTRADA

JOANNA B. THERIAULT

STEVE CRAIG DOSSENBACK

DENNIS KEITH ISSELMANN

THE BACA GRANDE PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

MATIE BELLE LAKISH

JANE ELIZABETH BROOKS

AYLA DANIELLE HOEVERS

Plaintiff / Appellant

BAYARDO RENO SANDY

Crestone, CO 81131

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Edward M. Allen

Attorney at Allen & Curry

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 1275

Denver, CO 80202

Theodore Allen Wells

Attorney at Allen & Curry

1125 Seventeenth Street, Suite 1275

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Bayardo Reno Sandy

609 Heatherbrae Road, P.O. Box 432

Crestone, CO 81131

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10800455] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Bayardo Reno Sandy. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's corrected brief due on 01/22/2021 for Bayardo Reno Sandy. [20-1413] [Entered: 01/15/2021 02:21 PM]

Open Document

[10800446] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy. Served on 01/15/2021 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1413]--[Edited 01/15/2021 by AT - Brief cited as deficient.] BRS [Entered: 01/15/2021 02:12 PM]

Open Document #5

Vol 5 pleadings

Open Document #4

Vol 4 pleadings

Open Document #3

Vol 3 pleadings

Open Document #2

Vol 2 pleadings

Open Document #1

Vol 1 pleadings

Open Document

[10791609] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 01/19/2021 for Bayardo Reno Sandy. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 12/29/2020. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/08/2020 08:42 AM]

Open Document

[10791603] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant/petitioner motion for permission to file electronically. See order for details. Served on 12/08/2020. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/08/2020 08:38 AM]

Open Document

[10791464] Appellant's motion filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy for permission to file electronically. Served on 12/01/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:35 PM]

Open Document

[10791460] Notice of change of address filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:21 PM]

Open Document

[10791458] Entry of appearance filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/01/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:19 PM]

Open Document

[10790633] Entry of appearance filed by Theodore Allen Wells for The Baca Grande Property Owners Association, Steve Craig Dossenback, Matie Belle Lakish, Dennis Keith Isselmann, Connie Estrada, Ayla Danielle Hoevers, Jane Elizabeth Brooks and Joanna B. Theriault. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/03/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1413] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:06 AM]

Open Document

[10790473] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edward M Allen for The Baca Grande Property Owners Association, Steve Craig Dossenback, Matie Belle Lakish, Dennis Keith Isselmann, Connie Estrada, Ayla Danielle Hoevers, Jane Elizabeth Brooks and Joanna B. Theriault. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1413] [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:03 PM]

Open Document #2

General Docketing Letter - Pro Se

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10800455] Notice of appellant's deficient brief received from Bayardo Reno Sandy. See attached letter for specifics. Appellant's corrected brief due on 01/22/2021 for Bayardo Reno Sandy. [20-1413] [Entered: 01/15/2021 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10800446] Appellant/Petitioner's brief filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy. Served on 01/15/2021 by email. Oral argument requested? Yes. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1413]--[Edited 01/15/2021 by AT - Brief cited as deficient.] BRS [Entered: 01/15/2021 02:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketThis duplicate docket entry has been removed from the docket. [AT] [10800435] Appellant's brief filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy. Served on 01/15/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [20-1413]--[Edited 01/15/2021 by AT to use correct event code as appellant brief has been filed. ] BRS [Entered: 01/15/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10791858] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 5, Comments: Vols 1-4 - pleadings. Record on appeal filed 12/09/2020. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/09/2020 07:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10791609] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief due on 01/19/2021 for Bayardo Reno Sandy. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 12/29/2020. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/08/2020 08:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10791603] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting Appellant/petitioner motion for permission to file electronically. See order for details. Served on 12/08/2020. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/08/2020 08:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10791464] Appellant's motion filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy for permission to file electronically. Served on 12/01/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10791460] Notice of change of address filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10791458] Entry of appearance filed by Bayardo Reno Sandy. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/01/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1413] [Entered: 12/07/2020 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10790633] Entry of appearance filed by Theodore Allen Wells for The Baca Grande Property Owners Association, Steve Craig Dossenback, Matie Belle Lakish, Dennis Keith Isselmann, Connie Estrada, Ayla Danielle Hoevers, Jane Elizabeth Brooks and Joanna B. Theriault. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 12/03/2020. Manner of Service: US mail [20-1413] [Entered: 12/03/2020 10:06 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • Docket[10790607] Entry of appearance submitted by Theodore A. Wells for Appellees Jane Elizabeth Brooks, Steve Craig Dossenback, Connie Estrada, Ayla Danielle Hoevers, Dennis Keith Isselmann, Matie Belle Lakish, The Baca Grande Property Owners Association and Joanna B. Theriault for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 12/03/2020. Manner of Service: US mail.--[Edited 12/03/2020 by JJH to fremove pdf as pleading filed 12/03/2020] [20-1413] TAW [Entered: 12/03/2020 09:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10790473] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Edward M Allen for The Baca Grande Property Owners Association, Steve Craig Dossenback, Matie Belle Lakish, Dennis Keith Isselmann, Connie Estrada, Ayla Danielle Hoevers, Jane Elizabeth Brooks and Joanna B. Theriault. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 12/02/2020. Manner of Service: email [20-1413] [Entered: 12/02/2020 03:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket[10790461] Entry of appearance submitted by Edward M. Allen for Appellees Jane Elizabeth Brooks, Steve Craig Dossenback, Connie Estrada, Ayla Danielle Hoevers, Dennis Keith Isselmann, Matie Belle Lakish, The Baca Grande Property Owners Association and Joanna B. Theriault for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 12/02/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-1413]--[Edited 12/02/2020 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 12/2/2020] EMA [Entered: 12/02/2020 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10786971] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 11/18/2020 Notice of appearance due on 12/02/2020 for Jane Elizabeth Brooks, Steve Craig Dossenback, Connie Estrada, Ayla Danielle Hoevers, Dennis Keith Isselmann, Matie Belle Lakish, The Baca Grande Property Owners Association and Joanna B. Theriault. Notice of appearance due on 12/18/2020 for Bayardo Reno Sandy. [20-1413] [Entered: 11/18/2020 10:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less