This case was last updated from PACER on 04/26/2021 at 06:02:33 (UTC).

Sandra Rumanek v. Sherry Fallon, et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 Sandra Rumanek filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Sherry Fallon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1348

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

SHERRY R. FALLON

CHARLES E. BUTLER

MATTHEW F. BOYER

PATRICK J. O'HARE

R. SCOTT OSWALD

SUSAN JUDGE

LISA AMATUCCI

MATT DENN, Delaware Attorney General

RICHARD R. COOCH

JOSEPH J. RHOADES

LOUIS J. RIZZO, JR.

Wilmington, DE 19803

TIMOTHY M. HOLLY

ANNETTE FURMAN

STATE OF DELAWARE

SANDRA F. CLARK

SPILLAN, Delaware State Police Officer Spillan, IBM 770

NICHOLAS WOODFIELD

DAVID G. CULLEY

ROBERT CRUIKSHANK

Plaintiff / Appellant

SANDRA RUMANEK

Vancouver, WA 98661

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Laura S. Irwin Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

700 Grant Street, Suite 4000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Joseph C. Handlon Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Delaware

820 North French Street, Carvel Office Building

Wilmington, DE 19801

Ryan T. Costa Esq.

Attorney at Office of Attorney General of Delaware

820 North French Street, Carvel Office Building

Wilmington, DE 19801

John D. Balaguer Esq.

Attorney at White & Williams

600 North King Street, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Herbert W. Mondros Esq.

Attorney at Rigrodsky Law

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 210

Wilmington, DE 19801

Krista M. Reale Esq.

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Diane M. Coffey Esq.

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 800

Wilmington, DE 19801

Christopher A. Tinari Esq.

Attorney at Margolis Edelstein

170 South Independence Mall West, The Curtis Center, Suite 400E

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Loren R. Barron Esq.

Attorney at Elzufon Austin & Mondell

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1700

Wilmington, DE 19801

John Elzufon Esq.

Attorney at Elzufon Austin & Mondell

300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1700

Wilmington, DE 19801

Arthur D. Kuhl Esq.

Attorney at Reger Rizzo & Darnall

1521 Concord Pike, Brandywine Plaza West, Suite 305

Wilmington, DE 19803

Louis J. Rizzo Esq. Jr.

Attorney at Reger Rizzo & Darnall

1521 Concord Pike, Brandywine Plaza West, Suite 305

Wilmington, DE 19803

Kimberly A. Boyer-Cohen Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

2000 Market Street, Suite 2300

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Jessica L. Tyler Esq.

Attorney at Marshall Dennehey Warner Coleman & Goggin

1007 North Orange Street, Nemours Building, Suite 600

Wilmington, DE 19801

Laura D. Hatcher Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

1313 North Market Street, Hercules Building, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jennifer L. Hall Esq.

Attorney at Office of United States Attorney

1313 North Market Street, Hercules Building, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sandra Rumanek

4801 East 5Th Street

Vancouver, WA 98661

Other Attorneys

Bernard G. Conaway Esq.

Attorney at Conaway-Legal

1007 North Orange Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #4

Case Opening Letter

1 #3

Case Caption

1 #2

District Court Order

#1

Notice of Appeal

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Krista M. Reale, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Nicholas W. Woodfield, R. Scott Oswald. [21-1348] (KMR) [Entered: 03/23/2021 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ryan T. Costa on behalf of Appellee(s) State of Delaware, Richard R. Cooch, Patrick J. O'Hare, Matt Denn, Charles E. Butler, Dennis Spillan, Susan Judge, Annette Furman and Lisa Amatucci. [21-1348] (RTC) [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Joseph C. Handlon, Esq. for State of Delaware, Richard R. Cooch, Patrick J. O'Hare, Matt Denn, Charles E. Butler, Spillan, Susan Judge, Annette Furman and Lisa Amatucci requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 03/30/2021. (SB) [Entered: 03/16/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC ADDENDUM to PETITION on behalf of Appellant Ms. Sandra Rumanek in 21-1348, 21-1349 containing Addendum to petition, documents returned to Rumanek by district court clerk and received after her filing with this Court.. Certificate of Service dated 03/15/2021 by ECF. [21-1348, 21-1349] (SR) [Entered: 03/15/2021 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy M. Holly, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Independent School Management, Inc.. [21-1348] (Docume]nt removed as filed in incorrect case]--[Edited 03/16/2021 by SB] (TMH) [Entered: 03/12/2021 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Christopher A. Tinari, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Nicholas W. Woodfield; R. Scott Oswald. [21-1348, 21-1349] (CAT) [Entered: 03/10/2021 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura D. Hatcher on behalf of Appellee(s) Robert Cruikshank. [21-1348] (LDH) [Entered: 03/05/2021 09:56 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra Rumanek The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order. (SB) [Entered: 03/05/2021 09:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Laura Schleich Irwin on behalf of Appellee(s) Sherry R. Fallon. [21-1348] (LSI) [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Arthur D. Kuhl, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Louis J. Rizzo, Sandra Clark. [21-1348] (ADK) [Entered: 03/02/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Loren Barron on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph J. Rhoades. [21-1348] (LRB) [Entered: 03/01/2021 03:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John Elzufon on behalf of Appellee(s) Joseph J. Rhoades. [21-1348] (JE) [Entered: 03/01/2021 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from John D. Balaguer on behalf of Appellee(s) Timothy M. Holly, Mary I. Akhimien, Matthew F. Boyer. [21-1348, 21-1349] (JDB) [Entered: 03/01/2021 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kimberly A. Boyer-Cohen on behalf of Appellee(s) David G. Culley. [21-1348] (KAB) [Entered: 02/26/2021 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra Rumanek to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 03/08/2021. Clerk's Office made service on 02/25/2021. Service made by ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/25/2021 03:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (AMR) [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra Rumanek in District Court No. 1-17-cv-00123. (AMR) [Entered: 02/25/2021 02:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bernard G. Conaway