This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2021 at 06:21:35 (UTC).

Sandra Ojo, et al v. Hudson County Savings Bank FSB, et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 Sandra Ojo filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Hudson County Savings Bank FSB. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2840

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

SANDRA OJO

Sparta, NJ 07871

TEMIDAYO B. OJO

Sparta, NJ 07871

Defendant / Appellees

HUDSON COUNTY SAVINGS BANK FSB

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

NEW CENTURY FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

BANK OF AMERICA NA

COUNTRYWIDE BANK

MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST CO

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

FRENKEL LAMBERT & GORDON & WEISSMAN LP

FIDELITY NATIONAL LAW GROUP

M&S PROCESS SERVERS LLC

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS SERVICING LP

MILSTEAD & ASSOCIATES LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Sandra Ojo

1 Lambert Drive

Sparta, NJ 07871

Temidayo B. Ojo

1 Lambert Drive

Sparta, NJ 07871

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

James P. Berg Esq.

Attorney at Parker Ibrahim & Berg

1635 Market Street, 7 Penn Center, 11Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Connie F. Jones Esq.

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

800 Capitol Street, Suite 2400

Houston, TX 77002

Eugene R. Mariano Esq.

Attorney at Parker McCay

9000 Midlantic Drive, Suite 300

Mount Laurel, NJ 08054

Ellen B. Silverman Esq.

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson

800 Third Avenue, 13Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Michael J. Peters Esq.

Attorney at Pressler Felt & Warshaw

7 Entin Road

Parsippany, NJ 07054

Timothy Ziegler Esq.

Attorney at Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman & Gordon

80 Main Street

West Orange, NJ 07052

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellants Sandra Ojo and Temidayo B. Ojo due on or before 12/13/2021. Appendix due on or before 12/13/2021. (CJG) [Entered: 11/03/2021 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) COPY OF ORDER OF DISTRICT COURT dated 11/01/2021 signed by Julien Xavier Neals. (CJG) [Entered: 11/03/2021 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: STATUS REPORT received from Appellees Bank of America NA and Manufacturers and Traders Trust Co. Certificate of Service dated 11/01/2021. Service made by ECF. [21-2840] (CFJ) [Entered: 11/01/2021 02:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Timothy Ziegler, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Frenkel Lambert Weiss Weisman and Gordon LLP. [21-2840] (TZ) [Entered: 10/21/2021 12:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • Docket(#11) Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 10/14/2021. (SB) [Entered: 10/18/2021 10:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Timothy Ziegler, Esq. for Frenkel Lambert & Gordon & Weissman LP requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 10/29/2021. (SB) [Entered: 10/15/2021 09:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee New Century Financial Services Inc. [21-2840] (MJP) [Entered: 10/14/2021 10:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Michael J. Peters, Esq., on behalf of Appellee(s) New Century Financial Services, Inc.. [21-2840] (MJP) [Entered: 10/14/2021 10:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Connie Flores Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) Manufacturers and Traders Trust Co., on its own behalf and as S/B/M to Hudson City Savings Bank, FSB, improperly named as "Hudson County Savings Bank, FSB". [21-2840] (CFJ) [Entered: 10/14/2021 05:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Connie Flores Jones on behalf of Appellee(s) Bank of America, N.A., on its own behalf and as S/B/M to (i) Countrywide Bank; (ii) BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP; (iii) Countrywide Home Loans Servicing, LP. [21-2840] (CFJ) [Entered: 10/14/2021 05:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Midland Funding LLC. [21-2840] (EBS) [Entered: 10/13/2021 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Ellen B. Silverman on behalf of Appellee(s) Midland Funding, LLC. [21-2840] (EBS) [Entered: 10/06/2021 03:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK ORDER - RULE 4(a)(4) staying case pending disposition of post decision motion(s). (SB) [Entered: 10/06/2021 12:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (SB) [Entered: 09/30/2021 04:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Sandra Ojo and Temidayo B. Ojo in District Court No. 2-19-cv-16200. (SB) [Entered: 09/30/2021 04:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MILSTEAD & ASSOCIATES, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW CENTURY FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Fidelity National Law Group is a litigant

Latest cases where MANUFACTURERS AND TRADERS TRUST COMPANY is a litigant