This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2019 at 06:04:06 (UTC).

Sandra Hale v. USA, et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2019 Sandra Hale filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-20164

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

SANDRA G. HALE

Spring, TX 77373

Defendant / Appellees

MICHAEL DEBAKEY MEDICAL CENTER (VA HOSPITAL)

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

RAJANI POTU, Doctor

STEPHEN SEDER, Doctor

DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS

BAYLOR UNIVERSITY SYSTEM

METREX RESEARCH CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sandra G. Hale

2318 Autumn Springs Lane

Spring, TX 77373

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Fred Turner Hinrichs

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

1000 Louisiana Street

Houston, TX 77002

Jaqualine Paige McMillan

Attorney at Norton Rose Fulbright US, L.L.P.

1301 Mckinney Street, Fulbright Tower

Houston, TX 77010-3095

 

Court Documents

Open Document

OPPOSED CORRECTED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale to compel deposition of Dr. Rajani Potu to be transcribed or release the recorders information to Appellant, to supplement the record on appeal with transcribed deposition of Dr Rajani Potu [9051250-3]. Replaces the motion filed 04/08/2019 Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [19-20164] Date of Service: 05/08/2019 [19-20164] (CAS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:29 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document #2

BR-5 Paper Filers Letter

Open Document #1

Appellant/Petitioner Brief Filed

Open Document #2

RE-5 Paper Filers Letter

Open Document #1

Record Excerpts Filed

Open Document #1

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #2

Corrected Motion Filed (replaces previously filed motion)

Open Document

RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9025192-1] to the Motion to compel filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale in 19-20164 [ # 9024908-2 ], Motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale in 19-20164 [ # 9024908-3 ] Date of Service: 04/09/2019. [19-20164] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Department of Veterans Affairs, Michael DeBakey Medical Center (VA Hospital), Ms. Rajani Potu, Mr. Stephen Seder and USA [9025192-1] to the Motion to compel filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale [ # 9024908-2 ], Motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale [ # 9024908-3 ] Date of Service: 04/09/2019 via email - Appellant Hale; Attorney for Appellees: Hinrichs, McMillan. [19-20164] (Fred Turner Hinrichs ) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:55 AM]

Open Document #2

MOT-1 Letter

Open Document #1

Motion Filed on Behalf of Party

Open Document

BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/13/2019 for Appellant Sandra G. Hale. [19-20164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:53 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-20164] (ABT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:15 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Fred Turner Hinrichs for Department of Veterans Affairs, Michael DeBakey Medical Center (VA Hospital), Ms. Rajani Potu, Mr. Stephen Seder and USA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20164] (Fred Turner Hinrichs ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:14 PM]

Open Document

INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011999-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 01:45 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9010886-2] NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale. [9010886-1] [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/21/2019 01:47 PM]

Open Document

CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9009611-2] NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale. [9009611-1] [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:41 PM]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSED CORRECTED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale to compel deposition of Dr. Rajani Potu to be transcribed or release the recorders information to Appellant, to supplement the record on appeal with transcribed deposition of Dr Rajani Potu [9051250-3]. Replaces the motion filed 04/08/2019 Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [19-20164] Date of Service: 05/08/2019 [19-20164] (CAS) [Entered: 05/13/2019 01:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale in 19-20164 [ # 9037363-2 ] Record Excerpts have been deemed sufficient. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied [19-20164] (CAS) [Entered: 05/09/2019 08:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale in 19-20164 [ # 9037313-2 ] Brief has been deemed sufficient. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. E/Res's Brief deadline updated to 05/28/2019 for Appellees Department of Veterans Affairs, Metrex Research Corporation, Michael DeBakey Medical Center (VA Hospital), Rajani Potu, Stephen Seder and United States of America [19-20164] (CAS) [Entered: 05/09/2019 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUFFICIENT APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Sandra G. Hale. # of Copies Provided: 7 [19-20164] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED; BRIEF IS INSUFFICIENT by Ms. Sandra G. Hale. Additionally the Brief requires See attached letter. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 1 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 05/09/2019 for Appellant Sandra G. Hale. [19-20164] (CAS) [Entered: 04/25/2019 11:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale. # of Copies Provided: 4 [19-20164] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require COS to include all attorneys, need 4 copies, all NOA's to be included, each order to have it's own tab, binding required.. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 1 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 05/09/2019 for Appellant Sandra G. Hale [19-20164] (CAS) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSED CORRECTED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale to compel deposition of Dr. Rajani Potu, to supplement the record on appeal with transcribed deposition of Dr. Rajani Potu [9029354-3]. Date of Service: 04/10/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: Need certificate of compliance Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 04/25/2019 for Appellant Sandra G. Hale [19-20164] (CAS) [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [9025192-1] to the Motion to compel filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale in 19-20164 [ # 9024908-2 ], Motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale in 19-20164 [ # 9024908-3 ] Date of Service: 04/09/2019. [19-20164] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Department of Veterans Affairs, Michael DeBakey Medical Center (VA Hospital), Ms. Rajani Potu, Mr. Stephen Seder and USA [9025192-1] to the Motion to compel filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale [ # 9024908-2 ], Motion to supplement the record on appeal filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale [ # 9024908-3 ] Date of Service: 04/09/2019 via email - Appellant Hale; Attorney for Appellees: Hinrichs, McMillan. [19-20164] (Fred Turner Hinrichs ) [Entered: 04/09/2019 10:55 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale to compel Mr. Hinrichs to release the contact information for the reporter for Dr. Potu's deposition held on 3/11/19, to supplement the record on appeal with Dr. Potu's deposition held on 3/11/19 [9024908-3]. Date of service: 04/04/2019 Document is insufficient for the following reasons: needs certificates of conference and compliance Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 04/19/2019 for Appellant Sandra G. Hale [19-20164] (AS) [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/13/2019 for Appellant Sandra G. Hale. [19-20164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20164] (DDL) [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Fred Turner Hinrichs for Appellee Michael DeBakey Medical Center (VA Hospital) in 19-20164, Attorney Fred Turner Hinrichs for Appellee Rajani Potu in 19-20164, Attorney Fred Turner Hinrichs for Appellee Stephen Seder in 19-20164, Attorney Fred Turner Hinrichs for Appellee Department of Veterans Affairs in 19-20164, Attorney Fred Turner Hinrichs for Appellee USA in 19-20164 [19-20164] (ABT) [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-20164] (ABT) [Entered: 03/25/2019 02:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Fred Turner Hinrichs for Department of Veterans Affairs, Michael DeBakey Medical Center (VA Hospital), Ms. Rajani Potu, Mr. Stephen Seder and USA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20164] (Fred Turner Hinrichs ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:16-CV-1189 4:16-CV-3071. Electronic ROA due on 04/09/2019. [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011999-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9010886-2] NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale. [9010886-1] [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/21/2019 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9009611-2] NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale. [9009611-1] [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/20/2019 01:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Sandra G. Hale [19-20164] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/15/2019 10:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.