This case was last updated from PACER on 06/09/2019 at 06:12:16 (UTC).

Sandra Dressler v. Equifax, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Sandra Dressler filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-11366

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

SERVICE

Plaintiff / Appellant

SANDRA K. DRESSLER

Cape Coral, FL 33904

Defendant / Appellees

EDUCATION CREDIT MANAGEMENT CORPORATION

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

EQUIFAX, INC.

NAVIENT CORPORATION

PIONEER CREDIT RECOVERY, INC.

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION

NAVIENT SOLUTIONS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Marie T. Rives

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1100

Tampa, FL 33602

Barbara Fernandez

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP

2525 Ponce De Leon Blvd 4Th Fl

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Richard B. Weinman

Attorney at Winderweedle Haines Ward & Woodman, PA

329 Park Ave N Fl 2, Po Box 880

Winter Park, FL 32790-0880

John Anthony Love

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

John P. Brumbaugh

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP

1180 Peachtree St Ne Ste 1600

Atlanta, GA 30309

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sandra K. Dressler

3823 Se 11Th Pl Unit 1

Cape Coral, FL 33904

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Sandra K. Dressler has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 05/30/2019 08:39 AM]

Open Document

JOINT Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc. and Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. [19-11366]--[Edited to show joint reponse 05/24/2019 by DHH] (ECF: Barbara Fernandez) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:34 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Barbara Fernandez for Navient Corporation; Navient Solutions, Inc. and Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. [19-11366] (ECF: Barbara Fernandez) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:33 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Barbara Fernandez for Service. [19-11366] (ECF: Barbara Fernandez) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:18 AM]

Open Document

Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Sandra K. Dressler. [Entered: 05/24/2019 01:21 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marie T. Rives for Service. [19-11366] (ECF: Marie Rives) [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:24 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Sandra K. Dressler. [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:54 AM]

Open Document #2

JQ Issued

Open Document #1

JUR-1 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Richard B. Weinman for Education Credit Management Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11366] (ECF: Richard Weinman) [Entered: 05/08/2019 07:20 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Anthony Love for Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [19-11366] (ECF: John Love) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:29 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John P. Brumbaugh for Equifax [19-11366] (ECF: John Brumbaugh) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:26 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Sandra K. Dressler. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:58 AM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard B. Weinman for Education Credit Management Corporation [19-11366] (ECF: Richard Weinman) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:22 AM]

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF DISMISSAL: Pursuant to the 11th Cir.R. 42-2(c), this appeal is hereby DISMISSED for want of prosecution because the appellant Sandra K. Dressler has failed to file an appellant's brief within the time fixed by the rules [Entered: 05/30/2019 08:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JOINT Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Navient Corporation, Navient Solutions, Inc. and Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. [19-11366]--[Edited to show joint reponse 05/24/2019 by DHH] (ECF: Barbara Fernandez) [Entered: 05/24/2019 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Barbara Fernandez for Navient Corporation; Navient Solutions, Inc. and Pioneer Credit Recovery, Inc. [19-11366] (ECF: Barbara Fernandez) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Barbara Fernandez for Service. [19-11366] (ECF: Barbara Fernandez) [Entered: 05/24/2019 08:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellant Sandra K. Dressler. [Entered: 05/24/2019 01:21 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marie T. Rives for Service. [19-11366] (ECF: Marie Rives) [Entered: 05/17/2019 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Sandra K. Dressler. [Entered: 05/15/2019 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to Sandra K. Dressler. [Entered: 05/10/2019 02:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Richard B. Weinman for Education Credit Management Corporation. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11366] (ECF: Richard Weinman) [Entered: 05/08/2019 07:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-11366] (ECF: John Love) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John Anthony Love for Equifax Information Services LLC and EFX. [19-11366] (ECF: John Love) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by John P. Brumbaugh for Equifax [19-11366] (ECF: John Brumbaugh) [Entered: 05/07/2019 10:26 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Sandra K. Dressler. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 05/06/2019 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard B. Weinman for Education Credit Management Corporation [19-11366] (ECF: Richard Weinman) [Entered: 04/23/2019 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Sandra K. Dressler on 04/09/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/20/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/24/2019 as to Appellant Sandra K. Dressler. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/08/2019 as to Appellee Equifax Information Services LLC [Entered: 04/15/2019 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.