This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/09/2019 at 06:09:23 (UTC).

Sandoval v. UNUM Life Insurance

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 Sandoval filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNUM Life Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1047

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, AKA Unum

Plaintiff / Appellant

BRENDA SANDOVAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Eric V. Hall

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

90 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 1100

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Stephen Michael Bressler

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

201 East Washington Street, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Nicole King Gorham

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

1200 17Th Street, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Kenneth J. Shakeshaft

1935 Jamboree Drive, Suite 200

Colorado Springs, CO 80920

Joseph M. Gorman

1935 Jamboree Drive, Suite 200

Colorado Springs, CO 80920

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Preliminary ROA

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10636397] Order filed by Clerk of the Court. This matter comes on for consideration of the appellant's status report filed on 3/25/2019. This appeal remains abated pending further order of this court. Please see order for additional information. Status report due 04/26/2019 by Brenda Sandoval. Served on 03/27/2019. [19-1047] [Entered: 03/27/2019 02:05 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10635840] Status report filed by Brenda Sandoval. Served on 03/25/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1047] KJS [Entered: 03/25/2019 04:39 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10630045] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric V. Hall for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (note, interested parties listed have been previously disclosed). Served on 02/28/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1047] [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:43 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10629986] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Nicole King Gorham for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Interested party already in the appeal. Served on 02/28/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1047] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:27 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10629983] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Stephen Michael Bressler for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 02/27/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1047] [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:23 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docket[10629981] Entry of appearance submitted by Stephen Bressler for Appellee UNUM Life Insurance Company of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 02/28/2019 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 2/28/2019.][19-1047] EVH [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docket[10629979] Entry of appearance submitted by Nicole K. Gorham for Appellee UNUM Life Insurance Company of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 02/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1047]--[Edited 02/28/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 2/28/2019] EVH [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:15 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • Docket[10629978] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric V. Hall for Appellee UNUM Life Insurance Company of America for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/28/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1047] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed and to reflect that the interested parties listed have been previously disclosed-- Edited 02/28/2019 by NA] EVH [Entered: 02/28/2019 10:12 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10628831] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: no entry of appearance filed on behalf of appellees. Notice of appearance due on 03/07/2019 for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. [19-1047] [Entered: 02/25/2019 07:29 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10628250] Order filed by Clerk of the Court upon review of the appellant's docketing statement, abating the appeal pending disposition of the motion for judgment as a matter of law (D.C. Docket No. 137) currently pending before the district court. The district clerk shall file a supplemental preliminary record as soon as the district court rules on the motion. Status report due for Brenda Sandoval within 5 days of entry of an order disposing of the motion, or by 03/25/2019 if the district court has not yet ruled on the motion. Served on 02/21/2019. [19-1047] [Entered: 02/21/2019 09:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10628175] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Kenneth J. Shakeshaft for Brenda Sandoval. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (interested parties listed have been previously disclosed). Served on 02/20/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-1047] [Entered: 02/21/2019 06:45 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docket[10628164] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 02/27/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1047] [Entered: 02/20/2019 05:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10628160] A transcript is not necessary for this appeal form filed by Brenda Sandoval. Transcript ordered: None necessary. Served on: 02/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1047] --[Edited 02/20/2019 by AT to reflect transcripts were not ordered. ] KJS [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:45 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10628159] Docketing statement filed by Brenda Sandoval. Served on 02/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1047] KJS [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:43 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Docket[10628157] Entry of appearance submitted by Kenneth J. Shakeshaft for Appellant Brenda Sandoval for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 02/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1047] [Edited to remove PDF as pleading has been filed-- Edited 02/21/2019 by NA] KJS [Entered: 02/20/2019 04:42 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10625415] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 02/07/2019. Docketing statement, transcript order form and entry of appearance due 02/22/2019 for Brenda Sandoval. Notice of appearance due on 02/22/2019 for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America [19-1047] [Entered: 02/08/2019 07:28 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less