This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/06/2019 at 06:06:05 (UTC).

Sandoval v. UNUM Life Insurance

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Sandoval filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against UNUM Life Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1164

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

UNUM LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, AKA Unum

Plaintiff / Appellee

BRENDA SANDOVAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Eric V. Hall

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

90 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 1100

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Stephen Michael Bressler

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

201 East Washington Street, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Nicole King Gorham

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

1200 17Th Street, Suite 3000

Denver, CO 80202

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Kenneth J. Shakeshaft

1935 Jamboree Drive, Suite 200

Colorado Springs, CO 80920

Joseph M. Gorman

1935 Jamboree Drive, Suite 200

Colorado Springs, CO 80920

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

General Docket Letter - Counsel - Civil

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Appendix Volume 1

Open Document #3

Appendix Volume 2

Open Document #1

Appendix Volume One

Open Document #2

Appendix Volume Two

Open Document

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10660736] Notice of deficient first brief on cross-appeal received from Brenda Sandoval in 19-1047, 19-1164. See attached letter for specifics. [19-1047, 19-1164] [Entered: 07/05/2019 08:51 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10659671] Appellant's appendix filed by Brenda Sandoval in 19-1047. Total number of volumes filed: 2. Served on 07/01/2019. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1047, 19-1164] KJS [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:13 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10659639] First brief on cross-appeal filed by Brenda Sandoval in 19-1047. 7 (Counseled) paper copies to be provided to the court. Served on: 07/01/2019. Manner of service: email. Oral argument requested? No. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-1047, 19-1164] --[Edited 07/05/2019 by AT - Brief cited as deficient on 7/5/2019.] KJS [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:01 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docket[10650616] Cross-appeal schedule set. Issued on 05/22/2019. First brief on cross-appeal and appendix due 07/01/2019 for Brenda Sandoval [19-1047, 19-1164] [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:59 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • Docket[10650614] Filed notice record is complete. Served on 05/22/2019. [19-1164] [Entered: 05/22/2019 11:57 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10650447] Order filed by Clerk of the Court vacating the 6/27/19 deadline in 19-1047 to file appellant's brief and appendix. The court will reset the briefing deadline after it receives notice from the district court that the record is complete in the cross appeal, 19-1164. Briefing will then proceed on a cross-appeal briefing schedule. Served on 05/21/2019. [19-1047, 19-1164] [Entered: 05/21/2019 05:00 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docket[10649824] Minute order filed - Notice due that record is complete by 05/28/2019 for Jeffrey P. Colwell, Clerk of Court. (Text Only - No Attachment) [19-1164] [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:58 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10649810] Acknowledgment of transcript order filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Transcript ordered: None. Served on: 05/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1164] EVH [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10649809] Docketing statement filed by UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Served on 05/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1164] EVH [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:37 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10649800] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Eric V. Hall for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 05/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1164] [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:31 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Docket[10649792] Entry of appearance submitted by Eric V. Hall for Appellant UNUM Life Insurance Company of AmericaUNUM Group for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/20/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/20/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed][19-1164] EVH [Entered: 05/20/2019 11:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10648846] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Kenneth J. Shakeshaft for Brenda Sandoval. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y (parties previously disclosed). Served on 05/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. [19-1164] [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:39 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • Docket[10648845] Entry of appearance submitted by Kenneth John Shakeshaft for Appellee Brenda Sandoval in 19-1164 for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 05/15/2019. Manner of Service: email. --[Edited 05/15/2019 by SDS to remove pdf from entry as the pleading has been filed] [19-1164] KJS [Entered: 05/15/2019 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10646833] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/07/2019. Docketing statement due 05/21/2019 for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Transcript order form due 05/21/2019 for UNUM Life Insurance Company of America. Notice of appearance due on 05/21/2019 for Brenda Sandoval and UNUM Life Insurance Company of America [19-1164] [Entered: 05/07/2019 11:14 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less