This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/05/2022 at 20:29:05 (UTC).

Sanderson Farms, Inc., et al v. Amory Investments LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Sanderson Farms, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Amory Investments LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Seventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-8007

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Petitioners

SANDERSON FARMS, INC.

PERDUE FARMS, INCORPORATED

FOSTER FARMS, LLC

KOCH FOODS

HOUSE OF RAEFORD FARMS, INC.

WAYNE FARMS LLC

NORMAN W. FRIES, INC., d/b/a/ Claxton Poultry Farms

SIMMONS FOODS, INC.

HARRISON POULTRY, INC.

CASE FOODS, INC.

MOUNTAIRE FARMS, INC.

O.K. FOODS, INCORPORATED

AGRI STATS, INC.

Respondents

AMORY INVESTMENTS LLC

CAMPBELL SOUP COMPANY

CAMPBELL SOUP SUPPLY COMPANY, L.L.C.

JOHN SOULES FOODS, INC.

JOHN SOULES ACQUISITIONS LLC

SYSCO CORPORATION

TARGET CORPORATION

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul D. Clement

Attorney at KIRKLAND & ELLIS LLP

1301 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Andrew B. Dickson

Attorney at VENABLE LLP

600 Massachusetts Avenue, N.W.

Washington, DC 20001

Carmine R. Zarlenga

Attorney at MAYER BROWN LLP

1999 K Street N.W.

Washington, DC 20006-1101

Julie Johnston-Ahlen

Attorney at NOVACK & MACEY LLP

100 N. Riverside Plaza

Chicago, IL 60606-1501

Gregory G. Wrobel

Attorney at VEDDER PRICE P.C.

222 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601-1104

Christopher E. Ondeck

Attorney at PROSKAUER ROSE LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue N.W.

Washington, DC 20004-2533

James Franklin Herbison

Attorney at WINSTON & STRAWN LLP

35 W. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601-9703

Lynn H. Murray

Attorney at SHOOK, HARDY & BACON LLP

111 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-4418

Patricia Anne Gorham

Attorney at EVERSHEDS SUTHERLAND (US) LLP

999 Peachtree Street Ne

Atlanta, GA 30309-0000

Daniel Martin Feeney

Attorney at MILLER, SHAKMAN LEVINE & FELDMAN LLP

180 N. Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601-0000

Lawrence H. Heftman

Attorney at ARENTFOX SCHIFF LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

John P. Passarelli

Attorney at KUTAK ROCK LLP

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102

Jacob D. Koering

Attorney at MILLER CANFIELD PADDOCK & STONE

227 W. Monroe Street

Chicago, IL 60606-0000

Respondent Attorney

Scott E. Gant

Attorney at BOIES, SCHILLER & FLEXNER

1401 New York Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Other Attorneys

Julie B. Porter

Attorney at SALVATORE PRESCOTT & PORTER PLLC

1010 Davis Street

Evanston, IL 60201

W. Joseph Bruckner

Attorney at LOCKRIDGE GRINDAL NAUEN P.L.L.P.

100 Washington Avenue South

Minneapolis, MN 55401-2159

Steven Hart

Attorney at HART MCLAUGHLIN & ELDRIDGE, LLC

22 W. Washington Street

Chicago, IL 60602

Clifford H. Pearson

Attorney at PEARSON, SIMON & WARSHAW, LLP

15165 Ventura Boulevard

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Bruce L. Simon

Attorney at PEARSON SIMON WARSHAW & PENNY LLP

44 Montgomery Street

San Francisco, CA 94104

Joseph W. Cotchett

Attorney at COTCHETT PITRE & MCCARTHY LLP

840 Malcolm Road

Burlingame, CA 94010-0000

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) Added Attorney(s) Bobby Pouya for party(s) Respondent Maplevale Farms, Inc., in case 22-8007 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Bobby Pouya for Maplevale Farms, Inc., John Gross and Company, Inc., Ferraro Foods, Inc., Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. and Cedar Farms Co., Inc.. [19] [7245978] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007]--[Edited 07/05/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Pouya, Bobby) [Entered: 07/05/2022 11:23 AM]

#18

(#18) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel L. Warshaw for Maplevale Farms, Inc., John Gross and Company, Inc., Ferraro Foods, Inc., Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. and Cedar Farms Co., Inc.. [18] [7245971] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] [18] [7245971] [22-8007]--[Edited 07/05/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Warshaw, Daniel) [Entered: 07/05/2022 11:17 AM]

#17

(#17) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Clifford H. Pearson for Maplevale Farms, Inc., John Gross and Company, Inc., Ferraro Foods, Inc., Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. and Cedar Farms Co., Inc.. [17] [7245838] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] [17] [7245838] [22-8007]--[Edited 07/05/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Pearson, Clifford) [Entered: 07/01/2022 06:17 PM]

#16

(#16) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael P. Mayer for Petitioner Norman W. Fries, Inc.. [16] [7245810] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007]--[Edited 07/01/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Mayer is added to the docket.] (Mayer, Michael) [Entered: 07/01/2022 04:01 PM]

#15

(#15) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James Franklin Herbison for Petitioner Norman W. Fries, Inc.. [15] [7245794] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Herbison, James) [Entered: 07/01/2022 03:33 PM]

#14

(#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel E. Laytin for Petitioner Sanderson Farms, Inc.. Additional Parties: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division). [14] [7245559] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-8007] (Laytin, Daniel) [Entered: 06/30/2022 06:54 PM]

#13

(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christa C. Cottrell for Petitioner Sanderson Farms, Inc.. Additional Parties: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division). [13] [7245558] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [22-8007]--[Edited 07/01/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Cottrell is added to the docket and termed atty. Clement.] (Cottrell, Christa) [Entered: 06/30/2022 06:50 PM]

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lawrence H. Heftman for Petitioner Mountaire Farms, Inc.. [10] [7245302] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Heftman, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/29/2022 04:45 PM]

#9

(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Gregory G. Wrobel for Petitioner House of Raeford Farms, Inc.. [9] [7245157] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Wrobel, Gregory) [Entered: 06/29/2022 10:03 AM]

#8

(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Patricia Gorham for Petitioner Harrison Poultry, Inc.. [8] [7245121] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Gorham, Patricia) [Entered: 06/29/2022 08:44 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed Response in Opposition by Respondent Amory Investments LLC to PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL UNDER RULE 23(f). [7][7244849] [22-8007] (Bruckner, W.) [Entered: 06/27/2022 09:35 PM]

#6

(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steve W. Berman for Respondent Amory Investments LLC. [6] [7244848] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] --[Edited 06/28/2022 by ER - added Attorney Steve W. Berman] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 06/27/2022 08:01 PM]

#5

(#5) Added Attorney(s) Thomas M. Staunton for party(s) Petitioner Case Foods, Inc., in case 22-8007 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas M. Staunton for Petitioner Case Foods, Inc.. for Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. Additional Parties: Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. [5] [7244727] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007]--[Edited 06/27/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Staunton, Thomas) [Entered: 06/27/2022 02:52 PM]

#4

(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel M. Feeney for Petitioner Case Foods, Inc.. for Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. Additional Parties: Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. [4] [7244724] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Feeney, Daniel) [Entered: 06/27/2022 02:47 PM]

#3

(#3) ORDER re: Petition for permission to appeal under Rule 23(f). [ # 1 ] Counsel for the respondents shall file a response to the petition for permission to appeal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f). The response is due by June 27, 2022. MRO [3] [7242616] [22-8007] (PS) [Entered: 06/15/2022 10:47 AM]

1 #2

DC Docket

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Added Attorney(s) Bobby Pouya for party(s) Respondent Maplevale Farms, Inc., in case 22-8007 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Bobby Pouya for Maplevale Farms, Inc., John Gross and Company, Inc., Ferraro Foods, Inc., Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. and Cedar Farms Co., Inc.. [19] [7245978] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007]--[Edited 07/05/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Pouya, Bobby) [Entered: 07/05/2022 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel L. Warshaw for Maplevale Farms, Inc., John Gross and Company, Inc., Ferraro Foods, Inc., Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. and Cedar Farms Co., Inc.. [18] [7245971] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] [18] [7245971] [22-8007]--[Edited 07/05/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Warshaw, Daniel) [Entered: 07/05/2022 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Clifford H. Pearson for Maplevale Farms, Inc., John Gross and Company, Inc., Ferraro Foods, Inc., Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc. and Cedar Farms Co., Inc.. [17] [7245838] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] [17] [7245838] [22-8007]--[Edited 07/05/2022 by HTP to reflect addition of counsel.] (Pearson, Clifford) [Entered: 07/01/2022 06:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Michael P. Mayer for Petitioner Norman W. Fries, Inc.. [16] [7245810] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007]--[Edited 07/01/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Mayer is added to the docket.] (Mayer, Michael) [Entered: 07/01/2022 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney James Franklin Herbison for Petitioner Norman W. Fries, Inc.. [15] [7245794] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Herbison, James) [Entered: 07/01/2022 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel E. Laytin for Petitioner Sanderson Farms, Inc.. Additional Parties: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division). [14] [7245559] (L-No; E-No; R-No) [22-8007] (Laytin, Daniel) [Entered: 06/30/2022 06:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Christa C. Cottrell for Petitioner Sanderson Farms, Inc.. Additional Parties: Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Foods Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Production Division); Sanderson Farms, Inc. (Processing Division). [13] [7245558] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-Yes) [22-8007]--[Edited 07/01/2022 by FP to reflect that atty. Cottrell is added to the docket and termed atty. Clement.] (Cottrell, Christa) [Entered: 06/30/2022 06:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Filed Response with sealed item(s) by Respondent Amory Investments LLC to Petition for Permission to Appeal Under Rule 23(f). [12][7245395] [22-8007] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 06/30/2022 11:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Motion by Respondent Amory Investments LLC to seal Opposition to Petition for Permission to Appeal Under Rule 23(f). [11] [7245391] [22-8007] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 06/30/2022 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Lawrence H. Heftman for Petitioner Mountaire Farms, Inc.. [10] [7245302] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Heftman, Lawrence) [Entered: 06/29/2022 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Gregory G. Wrobel for Petitioner House of Raeford Farms, Inc.. [9] [7245157] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Wrobel, Gregory) [Entered: 06/29/2022 10:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Patricia Gorham for Petitioner Harrison Poultry, Inc.. [8] [7245121] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Gorham, Patricia) [Entered: 06/29/2022 08:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed Response in Opposition by Respondent Amory Investments LLC to PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO APPEAL UNDER RULE 23(f). [7][7244849] [22-8007] (Bruckner, W.) [Entered: 06/27/2022 09:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Steve W. Berman for Respondent Amory Investments LLC. [6] [7244848] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] --[Edited 06/28/2022 by ER - added Attorney Steve W. Berman] (Berman, Steve) [Entered: 06/27/2022 08:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Added Attorney(s) Thomas M. Staunton for party(s) Petitioner Case Foods, Inc., in case 22-8007 per disclosure statement. Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Thomas M. Staunton for Petitioner Case Foods, Inc.. for Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. Additional Parties: Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. [5] [7244727] (L-No; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007]--[Edited 06/27/2022 by AD to reflect the addition of counsel.] (Staunton, Thomas) [Entered: 06/27/2022 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Circuit Rule 26.1 Disclosure Statement and Appearance filed by Attorney Daniel M. Feeney for Petitioner Case Foods, Inc.. for Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. Additional Parties: Case Farms, LLC and Case Farms Processing, Inc.. [4] [7244724] (L-Yes; E-Yes; R-No) [22-8007] (Feeney, Daniel) [Entered: 06/27/2022 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re: Petition for permission to appeal under Rule 23(f). [ # 1 ] Counsel for the respondents shall file a response to the petition for permission to appeal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(f). The response is due by June 27, 2022. MRO [3] [7242616] [22-8007] (PS) [Entered: 06/15/2022 10:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • Docket(#2) THIS CAUSE CONSISTS OF MORE THAN 5 PARTIES FOR EITHER SIDE. The following are those parties to this cause as reflected on the District Court docket, yet are not reflected on the Appellate docket/caption for administrative purposes: PETITIONERS: Perdue Foods LLC, Foster Poultry Farms, JCG Foods of Alabama LLC, JCG Foods of Georgia LLC, Koch Meat Co., Inc., O.K. Farms, Inc., O.K. Industries, Simmons Prepared Foods, Inc., Case Farms, LLC, Case Farms Processing, Inc., Mountaire Farms, LLC, Mountaire Farms of Delaware, Inc. RESPONDENTS: Direct Purchaser Plaintiffs: Cedar Farms Co., Inc. Ferraro Foods of North Carolina, LLC, Ferraro Foods, Inc., Joe Christiana Food Distributors, Inc., John Gross and Company, Inc., Maplevale Farms, Inc. Commercial and Institutional Indirect Purchaser Plaintiffs: Alliance Healthcare System, Inc., Alpine Special Treatment Center, Inc., Avanti Restaurant, Inc., Bashara & Company, LC dba J. Morgans Steakhouse, Bodega Brew Pub, Inc., Bordenaros Pizza, Inc. dba Bordenaros Pizza, Brix Tavern, LLC, Chicken Joes, LLC, Da Big Blue Enterprises Corp. dba Blue Tropix Bar & Grill & Da Big Kahuna Waikiki, Dalianos, Inc. dba Dalionos Eat This, Inc. dba Some Like It Hot, Eowyn, LLC dba Cabana Fargo Stopping Center, LLC, FB Mall, LLC dba Fat Bellys, Floersch IGA, Inc. dba Rays Apple Market, France 44 Foods, Inc., Legacy 5, LLC d/b/a Mr. Jims Pizza, Little Figs, Inc., dba Figaretti's Restaurant, Midtown Bar and Grill LLC, Mookies Southern Cuisine LLC, Oregano Italian, LLC dba Oregano Italian Kitchen, Panchos Taqueria, Inc. dba Panchos Taqueria, Peppers Grill & Bar, Inc., Roost Fried Chicken LLC, Sargents Restaurant and Lounge Sullott Corporation, Sumner Country Restaurant & Creamery LLC dba Kelleys Row Restaurant & Pub, Tani Sushi Bistro, LLC, Telavi Hospitality, Inc. dba Levante, Tennis Bums, LLC, dba Alabama Joes, Tic-Tac-O, and Wildwood Tavern LLC. End-User Consumer Plaintiffs: Alison Pauk, Angela Ashby, Catherine Senkle, Christina Hall, Christopher Gilbert, Daniel M. Percy, Dianne Spell, Dina Morris, Dorothy Monahan, Eric Thomas, Ian Adams, James Flasch, Jason Liebich, Joshua Madsen, Kenneth Cote, Kenneth Michael Pitre, Kristin Davis, Leslie and David Weidner, Linda Cheslow, Margo Stack, Marilyn Stangeland, Matthew Hayward, Michael Perry, Natalie Wilbur, Richard Heftel, Stephen Holt, and William David Marino. [2] [7242214] [22-8007] (AD) [Entered: 06/13/2022 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Permission to appeal pursuant to F.R.C.P. 23(f) docketed. [1] [7242202] [22-8007]--[Edited 06/14/2022 by AD to reflect updated parties.] (AD) [Entered: 06/13/2022 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where John Soules Foods, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Norman W. Fries, Inc., is a litigant

Latest cases where Wayne Farms LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mountaire Farms, Inc. is a litigant