This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 05:32:47 (UTC).

Samuel Kent v. U.S. Office of the Inspector, et al

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Samuel Kent filed an Other lawsuit against U S Office of the Inspector. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-70391

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAMUEL JAMES KENT

Redding, CA 96002

Respondents

U.S. OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL

U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Samuel James Kent

4420 Brittany Dr.

Redding, CA 96002

Respondent Attorney

Kenneth Lee Salazar

Attorney at Department of the Interior

1849 C Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20240

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed Petitioner Samuel James Kent motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/04/2020. [11596819][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 02/14/2020 by BY] (JMR) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:30 PM]

1 #5

Petition for Review

1 #2

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

1 #3

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed Petitioner Samuel James Kent motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 02/04/2020. [11596819][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 02/14/2020 by BY] (JMR) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED PETITION FOR REVIEW. DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSE AND PRO SE PETITIONER. NOTIFIED RESPONDENTS OF FILING. SEND MQ: No. Petitioner brief due 05/04/2020 for Samuel James Kent. Respondent brief due 06/02/2020 for U.S. Department of the Interior and U.S. Office of the Inspector General. Petitioner's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11596806][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 02/14/2020 by BY] (JMR) [Entered: 02/13/2020 02:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.