This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 06:06:08 (UTC).

Samuel Fulton v. Secretary, Department of Corr., et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Samuel Fulton filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corr . This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-10624

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

SAMUEL AKBAR FULTON

Clermont, FL 34715-9025

Respondent / Appellees

ATTORNEY GENERAL, STATE OF FLORIDA

SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorney

Samuel Akbar Fulton

Attorney at Lake CI - Inmate Legal Mail

19225 Us Hwy 27

Clermont, FL 34715-9025

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Marjorie Vincent-Tripp

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

444 Seabreeze Blvd Fl 5

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

Ashley Moody

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

444 Seabreeze Blvd Fl 5

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8723656-2 ] to 04/26/2019. [Entered: 03/21/2019 07:11 AM]

Open Document

Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton. [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:43 AM]

Open Document

MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 04/26/2019 filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8723656-1] [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:41 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Samuel Akbar Fulton. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:14 PM]

Open Document #2

USDC Order or Motion on IFP

Open Document #1

HAB-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marjorie Vincent-Tripp for Appellees Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10624] (ECF: Marjorie Vincent-Tripp) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:52 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marjorie Vincent-Tripp for Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-10624] (ECF: Marjorie Vincent-Tripp) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:51 PM]

Open Document

USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton was filed on 02/15/2019. Docket Entry 27. [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:05 AM]

Open Document

USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton was filed on 01/17/2019. Docket Entry 24. [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:04 AM]

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- Doc #25

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #24

Open Document #2

Habeas Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-5 Notice to Counsel/Parties

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion for extension to file motion for COA filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8723656-2 ] to 04/26/2019. [Entered: 03/21/2019 07:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton. [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION for extension of time to file a Motion for Certificate of Appealability to 04/26/2019 filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8723656-1] [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8723653-1] [Entered: 03/20/2019 08:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Samuel Akbar Fulton. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Certificate of Interested Persons (CIP). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 03/07/2019 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying IFP as to Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton was filed on 02/22/2019. Docket Entry 29. [Entered: 02/25/2019 07:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Marjorie Vincent-Tripp for Appellees Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-10624] (ECF: Marjorie Vincent-Tripp) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Marjorie Vincent-Tripp for Attorney General, State of Florida and Secretary, Department of Corrections. [19-10624] (ECF: Marjorie Vincent-Tripp) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis as to Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton was filed on 02/15/2019. Docket Entry 27. [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • USDC order denying COA as to Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton was filed on 01/17/2019. Docket Entry 24. [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HABEAS APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Samuel Akbar Fulton on 02/15/2019 USDC motion pending: Motion for IFP filed on 02/15/2019. DE# 27. Fee Status: IFP Pending. No hearings to be transcribed. [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less