This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/01/2020 at 06:01:13 (UTC).

Samuel Araoye v. Noreen Skirkie, et al

Case Summary

On 03/02/2020 Samuel Araoye filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Noreen Skirkie. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1448

  • Filing Date:

    03/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

TOM WISMER, REFUND UNIT DIRECTOR

GLENN HARPER, HR MANAGER, REVENUE DEPT

NOREEN SKIRKIE, REFUND UNIT MANAGER

DENNIS GIBSON, DC47- LOCAL 2186 VICE PRESIDENT

KIA MILLER

STEPHANIE GAINES, SUPERVISOR, AGENCY- RECEIVABLE

Plaintiff / Appellant

SAMUEL O. ARAOYE

Springville, PA 18844

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Erica Kane Esq.

Attorney at City of Philadelphia

1515 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Meghan Byrnes Esq.

Attorney at City of Philadelphia

1515 Arch Street

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Lauren M. Hoye Esq.

Attorney at Willig Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Samuel O. Araoye

10606 Sr 3004

Springville, PA 18844

 

Court Documents

#1

Civil Case Docketed

1 #2

DC Order 1/31/20

1 #3

caption

1 #4

Standing Order

1 #5

Case Opening Letter

#3

#4

#5

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Meghan A. Byrnes on behalf of Appellee(s) Noreen Skirkie; Tom Wismer; Glenn Harper; Stephanie Gaines; Kia Miller. [20-1448] (MB) [Entered: 04/02/2020 11:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ONLY ORDER (Clerk) the mailing of documents was delayed due to the closure of the Byrne Courthouse. Due to the delay, any Court of Appeals deadlines set out in the Clerk Order dated 03/25/2020 or applicable under the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure shall be automatically extended by 14 days. The 14 day extension does not apply to parties who received electronic notification through the Court's ECF system. The extension is limited to those parties who only receive notification or service through U.S. Mail and it only applies to deadlines that were established while the Courthouse was closed. (KR) [Entered: 03/31/2020 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER (Clerk) granting motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Appellant Samuel O. Araoye The appeal will be submitted to a panel for determination under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2) or for summary action under Third Circuit L.A.R. 27.4 and I.O.P. 10.6. Appellant may submit argument, which should not exceed 5 pages, in support of the appeal. The document, with certificate of service, must be filed with the clerk within 21 days of the date of this order. (KR) [Entered: 03/25/2020 01:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION filed by Appellant Samuel O. Araoye to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Response due on 03/30/2020. Certificate of Service dated 03/20/2020. Service made by ECF. (KR) [Entered: 03/20/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Erica Kane, Esq. for Noreen Skirkie, Tom Wismer, Glenn Harper, Stephanie Gaines and Kia Miller requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 04/03/2020. (KR) [Entered: 03/20/2020 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee Dennis Gibson. [20-1448] (LMH) [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Lauren M. Hoye, Esquire on behalf of Appellee(s) Dennis Gibson, Vice President, AFSCME Local 2186. [20-1448] (LMH) [Entered: 03/05/2020 11:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Samuel O. Araoye in District Court No. 2-19-cv-00719. (TMM) [Entered: 03/02/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less