This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2019 at 05:06:11 (UTC).

Samnang Ros v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 a Other case was filed by Samnang Ros against William Barr in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-72848

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAMNANG ROS

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Emma Rekart Esquire

Attorney at Northwest Immigrant Rights Project

1119 Pacific Avenue, Suite 1400

Tacoma, WA 98402

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Petition for Review

1 #4

Notice to All Parties

1 #3

Counseled Immigration Packet

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review. COUNSELED. Petitioner detained? Unknown. Certified Administrative Record due 12/13/2019. Petitioner opening brief due 02/11/2020 for Samnang Ros. Respondent brief due 04/13/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11495201] (BY) [Entered: 11/12/2019 06:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less