This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/05/2020 at 09:10:55 (UTC).

Samatha Smith, et al v. USA

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Samatha Smith filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-11329

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

MICAH SMITH, the Court Appointed Personal Administrator as administrator of the estate of Sydney Smith

ANN HERRERA, the Court Appointed Personal Administrator as administrator of the estate of Robert Steven Smith

MICAH SMITH, individually

SAMATHA SMITH, individually

Defendant / Appellee

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Peter Lampros

Attorney at Hall & Lampros, LLP

1230 Peachtree St Ne Ste 950

Atlanta, GA 30309

Terry Dale Jackson

Attorney at Terry D. Jackson, PC

600 Edgewood Ave

Atlanta, GA 30312-1933

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Gabriel Adam Mendel

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Trishanda L. Treadwell

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

Jane Elizabeth McBath

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

75 Ted Turner Dr Sw Ste 600

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

Open Document

ORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including July 1, 2020 in which to file Appellants brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 9087368-2 ] JP [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:01 AM]

Open Document

TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 07/01/2020 filed by Samatha Smith and Ann Herrera. Motion is Unopposed. [9087368-1] [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 05/14/2020 05:05 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:55 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 02:56 PM]

Open Document

*FILED IN ERROR* Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 02:53 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Terry Dale Jackson for Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 02:47 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Trishanda L. Treadwell for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11329] (ECF: Trishanda Treadwell) [Entered: 04/15/2020 02:08 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Trishanda L. Treadwell for USA [20-11329] (ECF: Trishanda Treadwell) [Entered: 04/10/2020 02:18 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gabriel A. Mendel for USA [20-11329] (ECF: Gabriel Mendel) [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:32 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Elizabeth McBath for USA [20-11329] (ECF: Jane McBath) [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:09 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. No hearings. [Entered: 04/09/2020 10:04 AM]

Open Document #3

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #2

Order on Motion to Dismiss doc#13

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The motion for extension of time to and including July 1, 2020 in which to file Appellants brief is GRANTED, with the appendix due seven (7) days from the filing of the brief. [ # 9087368-2 ] JP [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:01 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 07/01/2020 filed by Samatha Smith and Ann Herrera. Motion is Unopposed. [9087368-1] [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 05/14/2020 05:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*FILED IN ERROR* Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 02:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Terry Dale Jackson for Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. [20-11329] (ECF: Terry Jackson) [Entered: 04/22/2020 02:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Terry Dale Jackson for Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page AND have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. **The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. Appearance of counsel forms are available on the court's website www.ca11.uscourts.gov. ** [Entered: 04/21/2020 03:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Trishanda L. Treadwell for Appellee USA. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [20-11329] (ECF: Trishanda Treadwell) [Entered: 04/15/2020 02:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Trishanda L. Treadwell for USA [20-11329] (ECF: Trishanda Treadwell) [Entered: 04/10/2020 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Gabriel A. Mendel for USA [20-11329] (ECF: Gabriel Mendel) [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by J. Elizabeth McBath for USA [20-11329] (ECF: Jane McBath) [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Terry Dale Jackson for Appellants Ann Herrera and Samatha Smith. No hearings. [Entered: 04/09/2020 10:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Ann Herrera, Micah Smith, Micah Smith and Samatha Smith on 04/06/2020. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/18/2020. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 04/20/2020 as to Appellants Micah Smith and Samatha Smith. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/04/2020 as to Appellee United States of America [Entered: 04/09/2020 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trishanda L. Treadwell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriel Adam Mendel

Latest cases represented by Lawyer U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jane Elizabeth McBath