This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/14/2020 at 06:05:43 (UTC).

Samantha Jackson v. AT&T Retirement Savings Plan, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2020 Samantha Jackson filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against AT T Retirement Savings Plan. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fifth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-30255

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Cross Appellants

FIDELITY WORKPLACE SERVICES, L.L.C.

AT&T RETIREMENT SAVINGS PLAN

AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES, L.L.C.

AT&T PENSION BENEFIT PLAN MOBILITY PROGRAM

AT&T SERVICES, INCORPORATED

AT&T INCORPORATED

Plaintiff / Appellant

SAMANTHA J. JACKSON

Lafayette, LA 70501

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Cross Appellant Attorneys

Ryan Griffitts

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

2001 Ross Avenue

Dallas, TX 75201

Wesley E. Stockard

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

3424 Peachtree Road, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30326-4803

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Samantha J. Jackson

221 Tennessee Street

Lafayette, LA 70501

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 07/07/2020 for Appellant Cross-Appellee Samantha J. Jackson. [20-30255] (MRW) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-30255] (MRW) [Entered: 05/28/2020 11:58 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 6:19-CV-116. Electronic ROA due on 05/28/2020. [20-30255] (RLL) [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketDISTRICT COURT ORDER of 05/13/2020 granting IFP for Appellant Cross-Appellee Ms. Samantha J. Jackson. [20-30255] (RLL) [Entered: 05/13/2020 03:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process (cross appeal and amended cross appeal). [9305993-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-30255] (AGL) [Entered: 05/04/2020 12:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Wesley E. Stockard for party(s) Appellee Cross-Appellant AT&T Retirement Savings Plan Appellee Cross-Appellant AT&T Pension Benefit Plan Mobility Program Appellee Cross-Appellant AT&T Mobility Services, L.L.C. Appellee Cross-Appellant Fidelity Workplace Services, L.L.C. Appellee Cross-Appellant AT&T Incorporated Appellee Cross-Appellant AT&T Services, Incorporated, in case 20-30255 [20-30255] (CB) [Entered: 04/29/2020 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-30255] (Wesley E. Stockard ) [Entered: 04/28/2020 04:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9301975-2] NOA filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants AT&T Incorporated, AT&T Mobility Services, L.L.C., AT&T Pension Benefit Plan Mobility Program, AT&T Retirement Savings Plan, AT&T Services, Incorporated and Fidelity Workplace Services, L.L.C.. [9301975-1] [20-30255] (AGL) [Entered: 04/28/2020 08:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9301964-2] Parties updated: Appellant Cross-Appellee Samantha J. Jackson, Appellees Cross-Appellants AT&T Retirement Savings Plan, AT&T Pension Benefit Plan Mobility Program, AT&T Incorporated, AT&T Services, Incorporated, Fidelity Workplace Services, L.L.C. and AT&T Mobility Services, L.L.C. in 20-30255. NOA filed by Appellees AT&T Incorporated, AT&T Mobility Services, L.L.C., AT&T Pension Benefit Plan Mobility Program, AT&T Retirement Savings Plan, AT&T Services, Incorporated and Fidelity Workplace Services, L.L.C.. [9301964-1] [20-30255] (AGL) [Entered: 04/28/2020 08:03 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9297689-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. (IFP pending in District Court). [20-30255] (AGL) [Entered: 04/21/2020 11:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2020
  • DocketDISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Ms. Samantha J. Jackson. [20-30255] (AGL) [Entered: 04/21/2020 11:18 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Samantha J. Jackson [20-30255] (AGL) [Entered: 04/15/2020 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Retirement Savings Plan is a litigant

Latest cases where FIDELITY WORKPLACE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Services Inc is a litigant