This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 08/02/2022 at 06:04:09 (UTC).

Sam Hargrove, et al v. Sleepys LLC

Case Summary

On 06/03/2022 Sam Hargrove filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Sleepys LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-2040

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

SAM HARGROVE, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

ANDRE HALL, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

MARCO EUSEBIO, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated

Defendant / Appellant

SLEEPYS LLC

Not Classified By Court

AC BAUTISTA LLC

A&P TRUCKING LLC

EMAK LLC

EMAK TRANSPORT

EMAK TRANSPORT INC

EUSEBIOS TRUCKING CORP

FB LOGISTICS CORP

GD DELIVERY SERVICES LLC

GEORGIAN SHIELD INC

AL TRANSPORT SERVICES CORP

HC TRUCKING LLC

ALS TRUCK DELIVERY LLC

I STEALTH LLC

ALS TRUCKING INC

JONATHAN LLC

CURVA TRUCKING LLC

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Harold L. Lichten Esq.

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Benjamin J. Weber Esq.

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Theo E.M. Gould Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

900 Third Avenue, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Matthew J. Hank Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Paul C. Lantis Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Jonathan L. Shaw Esq.

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

1601 Cherry Street, Three Parkway, Suite 1400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Transcript Scheduling Order Issued

15 #1

Transcript Scheduling Order

#14

(#14) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sleepys LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/06/2022 09:32 AM]

#13

(#13) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Sleepys LLC advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 10/26/202 Motion to Certify Class (ECF 297), to be filed by Frank Gable. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/06/2022 09:29 AM]

#12

(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Theo E.M. Gould on behalf of Appellant(s) Sleepy's LLC. [22-2040] (TEG) [Entered: 07/05/2022 08:14 PM]

#11

(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul C. Lantis on behalf of Appellant(s) Sleepy's LLC. [22-2040] (PCL) [Entered: 07/05/2022 08:05 PM]

#10

(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew J. Hank on behalf of Appellant(s) Sleepy's LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/05/2022 07:22 PM]

#9

(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Sleepys LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/05/2022 07:10 PM]

#8

(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sleepys LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/05/2022 07:08 PM]

#7

(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin J. Weber on behalf of Appellee(s) Sam Hargrove, Andre Hall, and Marco Eusebio, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. [22-2040] (BJW) [Entered: 07/05/2022 04:19 PM]

#6

(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harold L. Lichten on behalf of Appellee(s) Sam Hargrove, Andrew Hall, and Marco Eusebio, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. [22-2040] (HLL) [Entered: 07/05/2022 04:17 PM]

#5

(#5) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Harold L. Lichten, Esq. for Sam Hargrove, Andre Hall and Marco Eusebio and Benjamin J. Weber, Esq. for Sam Hargrove, Andre Hall and Marco Eusebio requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/19/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 07/05/2022 03:24 PM]

#3

(#3) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Theo E.M. Gould, Esq. for Sleepys LLC, Matthew J. Hank, Esq. for Sleepys LLC, Paul C. Lantis, Esq. for Sleepys LLC and Jonathan L. Shaw, Esq. for Sleepys LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form, Disclosure Statement, Information Statement, Concise Summary, and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/08/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 06/24/2022 01:40 PM]

1 #5

MEMORANDUM

1 #4

ORDER

1 #3

Notice of Appeal

1 #2

Case Caption

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER to Court Reporter Mr. Frank Gable directing transcripts, ordered on 07/06/2022 , to be filed by 08/08/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 07/06/2022 10:23 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sleepys LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/06/2022 09:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Sleepys LLC advising this court that transcripts are needed. Requested date(s) are: 10/26/202 Motion to Certify Class (ECF 297), to be filed by Frank Gable. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/06/2022 09:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Theo E.M. Gould on behalf of Appellant(s) Sleepy's LLC. [22-2040] (TEG) [Entered: 07/05/2022 08:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Paul C. Lantis on behalf of Appellant(s) Sleepy's LLC. [22-2040] (PCL) [Entered: 07/05/2022 08:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Matthew J. Hank on behalf of Appellant(s) Sleepy's LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/05/2022 07:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Sleepys LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/05/2022 07:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Sleepys LLC. [22-2040] (MJH) [Entered: 07/05/2022 07:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Benjamin J. Weber on behalf of Appellee(s) Sam Hargrove, Andre Hall, and Marco Eusebio, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. [22-2040] (BJW) [Entered: 07/05/2022 04:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harold L. Lichten on behalf of Appellee(s) Sam Hargrove, Andrew Hall, and Marco Eusebio, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated. [22-2040] (HLL) [Entered: 07/05/2022 04:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Harold L. Lichten, Esq. for Sam Hargrove, Andre Hall and Marco Eusebio and Benjamin J. Weber, Esq. for Sam Hargrove, Andre Hall and Marco Eusebio requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/19/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 07/05/2022 03:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FOLLOW UP LETTER to Theo E.M. Gould, Esq. for Sleepys LLC, Matthew J. Hank, Esq. for Sleepys LLC, Paul C. Lantis, Esq. for Sleepys LLC and Jonathan L. Shaw, Esq. for Sleepys LLC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form, Disclosure Statement, Information Statement, Concise Summary, and Transcript Purchase Order on or before 07/08/2022. (LMR) [Entered: 06/24/2022 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#2) RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR) [Entered: 06/03/2022 02:28 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Sleepys LLC in District Court No. 3-10-cv-01138, transferred from misc. docket 22-8011. (LMR) [Entered: 06/03/2022 02:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JONATHAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theo E.M. Gould

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN L. SHAW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEW J. HANK