This case was last updated from PACER on 05/09/2020 at 06:02:16 (UTC).

Sally Heyns v. Select Portfolio Servicing, In

Case Summary

On 03/10/2020 Sally Heyns filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, In. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Fourth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1280

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DOES 1 TO 50, Inclusive

U. S. BANCORP CENTER

JP MORGAN CHASE BANK

SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

SALLY HEYNS

Delaplane, VA 20144

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

John Alexander Nader

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD, PLLC

1275 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Donald Richard Pocock

Attorney at NELSON MULLINS RILEY & SCARBOROUGH, LLP

380 Knollwood Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27103-0000

Megan Theresa Hirt

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD, PLLC

1275 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Sally Heyns

10268 John Marshall Highway

Delaplane, VA 20144

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate case [ # 5 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Lauren French, Sally Heyns and Megan Hirt. [1000719129] [20-1280] TW [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:49 PM]

#12

(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U. S. Bancorp Center. [1000713316] [20-1280] John Nader [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:12 PM]

#11

(#11) RESPONSE/ANSWER by JP Morgan Chase Bank to notice requesting response [ # 8 ], Motion to consolidate case [ # 5 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [20-1280] Donald Pocock [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:14 AM]

#10

(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000711407] [20-1280] Donald Pocock [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:12 AM]

#9

(#9) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Briefs due 05/04/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000706668] [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/20/2020 05:16 PM]

#8

(#8) NOTICE ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase Bank, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U. S. Bancorp Center in 20-1280, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U. S. Bank National Association in 20-1282 requesting response to Motion to consolidate case [ # 5 ] Response due 03/30/2020..[1000706664].. [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/20/2020 05:10 PM]

#7

(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald R. Pocock for JP Morgan Chase Bank. [1000705445] [20-1280] Donald Pocock [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:58 PM]

#6

(#6) MOTION by Does 1 to 50 in 20-1280 to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 30 days.. Date and method of service: 03/16/2020. [1000705307] [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:44 AM]

#5

(#5) MOTION by Sally Heyns in 20-1280 to consolidate case 20-1282 with 20-1280. Date and method of service: 03/16/2020 US mail. [1000705302] [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:42 AM]

3 #2

Informal briefing order

3 #1

Electronic filing information

#2

(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/24/2020. [20-1280] CT [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:30 AM]

#1

(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01429-TSE-MSN. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-1280] CT [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:22 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER filed granting motion to consolidate case [ # 5 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Lauren French, Sally Heyns and Megan Hirt. [1000719129] [20-1280] TW [Entered: 04/10/2020 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL for Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U. S. Bancorp Center. [1000713316] [20-1280] John Nader [Entered: 04/01/2020 12:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE/ANSWER by JP Morgan Chase Bank to notice requesting response [ # 8 ], Motion to consolidate case [ # 5 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [20-1280] Donald Pocock [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JP Morgan Chase Bank. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000711407] [20-1280] Donald Pocock [Entered: 03/30/2020 09:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER filed granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 6 ] Number of days granted: 30. Informal Opening Briefs due 05/04/2020. Copies to all parties. [1000706668] [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/20/2020 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE ISSUED to JP Morgan Chase Bank, Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U. S. Bancorp Center in 20-1280, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and U. S. Bank National Association in 20-1282 requesting response to Motion to consolidate case [ # 5 ] Response due 03/30/2020..[1000706664].. [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/20/2020 05:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Donald R. Pocock for JP Morgan Chase Bank. [1000705445] [20-1280] Donald Pocock [Entered: 03/19/2020 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION by Does 1 to 50 in 20-1280 to extend filing time for informal opening brief until 30 days.. Date and method of service: 03/16/2020. [1000705307] [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION by Sally Heyns in 20-1280 to consolidate case 20-1282 with 20-1280. Date and method of service: 03/16/2020 US mail. [1000705302] [20-1280, 20-1282] CT [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:42 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • Docket(#4) ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01429-TSE-MSN. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR included? N/A. [20-1280] CT [Entered: 03/11/2020 08:40 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Informal Opening Brief due 04/03/2020. Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. [20-1280] CT [Entered: 03/10/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RECORD requested from Clerk of Court. Due: 03/24/2020. [20-1280] CT [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:30 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:18-cv-01429-TSE-MSN. Case manager: CathyHerb. [20-1280] CT [Entered: 03/10/2020 10:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant