Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/03/2020 at 06:04:49 (UTC).

Salem Pointe Capital, LLC v. BEP Rarity Bay, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/04/2020 Salem Pointe Capital, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BEP Rarity Bay, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-6016

  • Filing Date:

    09/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

BALD EAGLE VENTURES, LLC

BEP RARITY BAY, LLC

Petitioner / Appellant

RARITY BAY PARTNERS, fka Salem Pointe Capital Partners

Plaintiff / Appellee

SALEM POINTE CAPITAL, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Josh Kahane

Attorney at Glankler Brown

6000 Poplar Avenue, Suite 400

Memphis, TN 38119

Aubrey B. Greer

Attorney at Glankler Brown

6000 Poplar Avenue, Suite 400

Memphis, TN 38119

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Adrienne L. Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Busby

P.O. Box 2588

Knoxville, TN 37901

Shannon Van Tol

430 Montbrook Lane

Knoxville, TN 37919

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Brandon Layne Morrow

Attorney at Kramer Rayson

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 2500

Knoxville, TN 37929

Thomas M. Hale

Attorney at Kramer Rayson

800 S. Gay Street, Suite 2500

Knoxville, TN 37929

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-Up Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 10/09/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:48 AM]

#20

(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/12/2020. appellee brief now due 12/14/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:22 PM]

#19

(#19) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 10/02/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 09/24/2020 09:54 AM]

#18

(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC and BEP Rarity Bay, LLC by Aubrey B. Greer. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2020. [20-6016] (ABG) [Entered: 09/22/2020 01:00 PM]

#17

(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/28/2020; appellee brief due 11/27/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:22 AM]

#16

(#16) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Adrienne L. Anderson for Appellant Rarity Bay Partners.. Certificate of Service: 09/17/2020. [20-6016] (ALA) [Entered: 09/17/2020 05:25 PM]

#15

(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Rarity Bay Partners by Shannon van Tol. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2020. [20-6016] (SV) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:42 PM]

#12

No Description Available

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Rarity Bay Partners by Adrienne L. Anderson. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2020. [20-6016] (ALA) [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:45 PM]

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Josh Kahane for Appellee Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016]--[Edited 09/15/2020 by KSF] (JK) [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:43 PM]

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Josh Kahane for Appellee BEP Rarity Bay, LLC. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016]--[Edited 09/15/2020 by KSF] (JK) [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:40 PM]

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Brandon Layne Morrow for Appellee Salem Pointe Capital, LLC Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016] (BLM) [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:29 PM]

#6

(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees BEP Rarity Bay, LLC and Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC by S. Joshua Kahane. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016] (JK) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:53 AM]

#5

(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Salem Pointe Capital, LLC by Thomas M. Hale. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016] (TMH) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:17 AM]

#4

(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/28/2020 at 2:00 pm ET with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:51 PM]

#1

(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Rarity Bay Partners. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 11:08 AM]

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • Docket(#22) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Follow-Up Telephone Mediation Conference has been scheduled for 10/09/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 10/05/2020 10:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) BRIEFING LETTER SENT by Mediation Office, resetting briefing schedule: appellant brief now due 11/12/2020. appellee brief now due 12/14/2020. (LMR) [Entered: 09/25/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: The Telephone Mediation Conference has been rescheduled for 10/02/2020 at 9:30 AM (ET) with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (MLB) [Entered: 09/24/2020 09:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC and BEP Rarity Bay, LLC by Aubrey B. Greer. Certificate of Service: 09/22/2020. [20-6016] (ABG) [Entered: 09/22/2020 01:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 10/28/2020; appellee brief due 11/27/2020. (KSF) [Entered: 09/18/2020 08:22 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Ms. Adrienne L. Anderson for Appellant Rarity Bay Partners.. Certificate of Service: 09/17/2020. [20-6016] (ALA) [Entered: 09/17/2020 05:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Rarity Bay Partners by Shannon van Tol. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2020. [20-6016] (SV) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTIFICATION of PACER docket error for appearance form , [ # 11 ], filed by Ms. Adrienne L. Anderson for Rarity Bay Partners on behalf of Shannon Van Tol. Attorneys must use their personal PACER account to file any document and are not permitted to use their account to file on behalf of another attorney. Please refile using your own account within 24 hours. (KSF) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • Docket(#13) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - transcript is unnecessary for appeal purposes. Filed by Ms. Adrienne L. Anderson for Rarity Bay Partners. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2020. [20-6016] (ALA) [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) APPEARANCE filed for Appellant Rarity Bay Partners by Adrienne L. Anderson. Certificate of Service: 09/16/2020. [20-6016] (ALA) [Entered: 09/16/2020 03:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Josh Kahane for Appellee Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016]--[Edited 09/15/2020 by KSF] (JK) [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:43 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Josh Kahane for Appellee BEP Rarity Bay, LLC. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016]--[Edited 09/15/2020 by KSF] (JK) [Entered: 09/14/2020 04:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Brandon Layne Morrow for Appellee Salem Pointe Capital, LLC Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016] (BLM) [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellees BEP Rarity Bay, LLC and Bald Eagle Ventures, LLC by S. Joshua Kahane. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016] (JK) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:53 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Salem Pointe Capital, LLC by Thomas M. Hale. Certificate of Service: 09/14/2020. [20-6016] (TMH) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:17 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 09/28/2020 at 2:00 pm ET with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (CAW) [Entered: 09/08/2020 01:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Karen Fultz. (KSF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 11:14 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Rarity Bay Partners. Transcript needed: y. (KSF) [Entered: 09/04/2020 11:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BEP RARITY BAY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandon Layne Morrow