This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 07/13/2022 at 06:24:03 (UTC).

Salazar v. AT&T Mobility LLC

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Salazar filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-2320

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

HTC CORPORATION

HTC AMERICA, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOE A. SALAZAR

Defendant / Appellees and Defendant / Cross Appellants

AT&T MOBILITY LLC

SPRINT UNITED MANAGEMENT COMPANY

T-MOBILE USA, INC.

CELLCO PARTNERSHIP INC., dba Verizon Wireless, Inc.

HTC CORPORATION

HTC AMERICA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee, Defendant / Cross Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Fred Williams

Attorney at Williams, Simons, and Landis PLLC

601 Congress Avenue, The Littlefield Building

Austin, TX 78701

Todd Eric Landis

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

2633 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75204

John Wittenzellner

Attorney at Williams Simons & Landis PLLC

1735 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Dariush Keyhani

Attorney at Keyhani LLC

1050 30Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20007

 

Court Documents

#39

(#39) Notice from Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 06/13/2022 by email. [855229] [21-2320] [Fred Williams] [Entered: 06/13/2022 01:50 PM]

#37

(#37) Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts. Arguing counsel must advise of, and show good cause for, any scheduling conflicts during the upcoming court session months listed in the attached notice. The Response to Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . [853611] [JCW] [Entered: 06/06/2022 08:50 AM]

#35

(#35) ORDER filed denying [ # 28 ] motion to dismiss the cross-appeal, ECF No. 28; granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 23 ], ECF No. 23, only to the extent that the revised official caption is reflected above. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [852678] [LMS] [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:54 AM]

#32

(#32) MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY BRIEF FILED by Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Service: 04/26/2022 by email. [845550] --[Edited 04/26/2022 by JCW - compliance review complete] [Fred Williams] [Entered: 04/26/2022 04:01 PM]

#28

(#35) ORDER filed denying [ # 28 ] motion to dismiss the cross-appeal, ECF No. 28; granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 23 ], ECF No. 23, only to the extent that the revised official caption is reflected above. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [852678] [LMS] [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:54 AM]

#25

(#38) 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 34 ], [ # 25 ], [ # 11 ] received from Appellant Joe A. Salazar. [854491] [VDW] [Entered: 06/08/2022 05:11 PM]

#23

(#35) ORDER filed denying [ # 28 ] motion to dismiss the cross-appeal, ECF No. 28; granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 23 ], ECF No. 23, only to the extent that the revised official caption is reflected above. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [852678] [LMS] [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:54 AM]

#19

(#40) 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 32 ], [ # 19 ] received from Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc.. [855458] [VDW] [Entered: 06/14/2022 11:38 AM]

#11

(#38) 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 34 ], [ # 25 ], [ # 11 ] received from Appellant Joe A. Salazar. [854491] [VDW] [Entered: 06/08/2022 05:11 PM]

6 #2

Certificate of service

6 #1

Docketing Statement

5 #2

Certificate of service

5 #1

Entry of Appearance

4 #2

Certificate of service

4 #1

Certificate of Interest

#3

(#3) Official caption revised to relect cross-appeal with 21-2376. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [802857] [JCW] [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:36 PM]

1 #2

Civil Case Docketed

#1

Notice of Docketing

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) Notice from Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc. regarding conflicts with oral argument. Service: 06/13/2022 by email. [855229] [21-2320] [Fred Williams] [Entered: 06/13/2022 01:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 32 ], [ # 19 ] received from Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc.. [855458] [VDW] [Entered: 06/14/2022 11:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) 6 paper copies of Doc. No. [ # 34 ], [ # 25 ], [ # 11 ] received from Appellant Joe A. Salazar. [854491] [VDW] [Entered: 06/08/2022 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts. Arguing counsel must advise of, and show good cause for, any scheduling conflicts during the upcoming court session months listed in the attached notice. The Response to Notice to Advise of Scheduling Conflicts can be found # here . The Oral Argument Guide can be found # here . [853611] [JCW] [Entered: 06/06/2022 08:50 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • Docket(#36) Outstanding paper copies of all briefs and appendices must be submitted within five business days from the date of issuance of this notice. See Fed. Cir. R. 25(c)(3)(A). [853610] [JCW] [Entered: 06/06/2022 08:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER filed denying [ # 28 ] motion to dismiss the cross-appeal, ECF No. 28; granting motion to modify the official caption [ # 23 ], ECF No. 23, only to the extent that the revised official caption is reflected above. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [852678] [LMS] [Entered: 05/31/2022 11:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • Docket(#34) MODIFIED ENTRY: CONFIDENTIAL APPENDIX FILED by Appellant Joe A. Salazar. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847269]--[Edited 05/04/2022 by JCW - compliance review complete] [Dariush Keyhani] [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MODIFIED ENTRY: APPENDIX FILED by Appellant Joe A. Salazar. Service: 05/03/2022 by email. [847266] --[Edited 05/04/2022 by JCW - compliance review complete] [Dariush Keyhani] [Entered: 05/03/2022 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MODIFIED ENTRY: REPLY BRIEF FILED by Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Service: 04/26/2022 by email. [845550] --[Edited 04/26/2022 by JCW - compliance review complete] [Fred Williams] [Entered: 04/26/2022 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) REPLY of Appellant Joe A. Salazar to response [ # 30 ]. Service: 04/22/2022 by email. [845066] [21-2320] [Dariush Keyhani] [Entered: 04/22/2022 10:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Official caption revised to reflect appearance of HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [803013] [JCW] [Entered: 10/01/2021 08:43 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Docketing Statement for the Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Appellees HTC Corporation and HTC America, Inc. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802988] [21-2320] --[Edited 10/08/2021 by CAB to add party filers] [Fred Williams] [Entered: 09/30/2021 09:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interest for Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc. HTC Corporation; HTC America, Inc.. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802986] [21-2320] [Fred Williams] [Entered: 09/30/2021 09:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Entry of appearance for Fred I. Williams; Todd E. Landis; John Wittenzellner as counsel for Cross-Appellants AT&T Mobility LLC, Cellco Partnership Inc., Sprint United Management Company and T-Mobile USA, Inc. HTC Corporation; HTC America, Inc.. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802985] [21-2320] [Fred Williams] [Entered: 09/30/2021 09:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Joe A. Salazar. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802958] [21-2320] [Dariush Keyhani] [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Entry of appearance for Dariush Keyhani as counsel for Appellant Joe A. Salazar. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802956] [21-2320] [Dariush Keyhani] [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interest for Appellant Joe A. Salazar. Service: 09/30/2021 by email. [802955] [21-2320] [Dariush Keyhani] [Entered: 09/30/2021 05:12 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Official caption revised to relect cross-appeal with 21-2376. (see attached). Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. [802857] [JCW] [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • Docket(#2) Note to File: The following cases are consolidated: 21-2320 Lead with 21-2376 Cross-Appeal. The parties must file all documents in the lead appeal only. [802853] [21-2320, 21-2376] [JCW] [Entered: 09/30/2021 01:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 09/16/2021. [800009] Entry of Appearance is due on 09/30/2021. Certificate of Interest is due on 09/30/2021. Docketing Statement is due on 09/30/2021. Appellant's brief is due on 11/15/2021. [JCW] [Entered: 09/16/2021 02:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sprint/United Management Company is a litigant

Latest cases where HTC America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON WIRELESS LLC is a litigant