This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 06/29/2019 at 06:08:03 (UTC).

Saint-Gobain Ceramics v. II-VI Incorporated

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 Saint-Gobain Ceramics filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against II-VI Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Federal Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1819

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

II-VI INCORPORATED

II-VI OPTICAL SYSTEMS, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellant

SAINT-GOBAIN CERAMICS & PLASTICS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Keith Alan Rutherford

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002

Salvatore P. Tamburo

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Megan R. Wood

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP

1825 Eye Street Nw

Washington, DC 20006

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Ryan Malloy

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Ryan J. Malloy Esq.

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Seth W. Lloyd

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20008

Jack Williford Londen

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Deanne Maynard

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20008

Brian Robert Matsui

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

2000 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20008

 

Court Documents

#1

Notice of Docketing

1 #2

Civil case docketed

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) **TEXT ONLY** ORDER granting motion to extend time to file Appellant's opening brief [ # 15 ] filed by Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc. Brief is due 07/31/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court. This order has been issued without an attached document and is official and binding. [616128] [TAM] [Entered: 06/21/2019 04:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION of Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc. to extend the time to 07/31/2019 to file the Opening Brief currently due 7/01/2019. [Consent: unopposed]. Service: 06/21/2019 by email. [616071] [19-1819] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 06/21/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corrected Certificate of Interest for the Appellees II-VI Incorporated and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/15/2019 by email. [607636] [19-1819] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 05/15/2019 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Entry of appearance for Ryan J. Malloy as of counsel for Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Service: 05/15/2019 by email. [607514] [19-1819] [Ryan Malloy] [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:49 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF NON-COMPLIANCE: The submission of Appellees II-VI Incorporated and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc., Certificate of Interest [ # 9 ], is not in compliance with the rules of this court (see attached). Compliant document due on 05/22/2019. Service as of this date by the Clerk of Court.[607493] [TAM] [Entered: 05/15/2019 12:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Entry of appearance for Megan R. Wood as of counsel for Appellees II-VI Incorporated and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607271] [19-1819] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 05/14/2019 04:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Docketing Statement for the Appellees II-VI Incorporated and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607269] [19-1819] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interest for the Appellees II-VI Incorporated and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607264] [19-1819] This document is non-compliant. See Doc No.[ # 12 ] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Entry of appearance for Salvatore P. Tamburo as principal counsel for Appellees II-VI Incorporated and II-VI Optical Systems, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607261] [19-1819] [Salvatore Tamburo] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Entry of appearance for Seth W. Lloyd as of counsel for Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607250] [19-1819] [Seth Lloyd] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Entry of appearance for Jack W. Londen as of counsel for Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607248] [19-1819] [Jack Londen] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Entry of appearance for Brian R. Matsui as of counsel for Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607247] [19-1819] [Brian Matsui] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Docketing Statement for the Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607245] [19-1819] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Interest for the Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607244] [19-1819] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Entry of appearance for Deanne E. Maynard as principal counsel for Appellant Saint-Gobain Ceramics & Plastics, Inc.. Service: 05/14/2019 by email. [607243] [19-1819] [Deanne Maynard] [Entered: 05/14/2019 03:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Appeal docketed. Received: 04/25/2019. [603918] Entry of Appearance due 05/14/2019. Certificate of Interest is due on 05/14/2019. Docketing Statement due 05/14/2019. Appellant's brief is due 07/01/2019. [TAM] [Entered: 04/30/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where II-VI INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where Saint-Gobain Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jack W Londen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan James Malloy