This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:04:05 (UTC).

Saidin v. City of New York

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Saidin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of New York. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2146

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jane Doe

United Beef Sausage Company

Syed Farhaj Hassan

Moiz Mohammed

Muslim Foundation, Inc.

Sofia Tahir

Zaimah Abdur Rahim

Canada, Inc.

The Council of Imams in New Jersey

Abdul Hakim Abdullah

AM Body Shop Inside & Outside

Muslim Student Association of the U.S.

Defendant / Appellee

City of New York

Plaintiff / Appellant

Mohammad Ariff Saidin

Bronx, NY 10473

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Zachary W. Carter

Attorney at New York City Law Department

100 Church Street

New York, NY 10007

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Mohammad Ariff Saidin

639 Rosedale Avenue, Apt. 1B

Bronx, NY 10473

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in form pauperis, [4], on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2610303] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:24 PM]

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

6 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#2

(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2610295] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:05 PM]

#7

(#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610307] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:38 PM]

#9

(#9) ORDER, dated 08/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/26/2019, unless Appellant Mohammed Ariff Saidin, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2624110] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:11 PM]

#13

(#13) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for summary reversal, on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2626232] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:54 AM]

#12

(#12) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2626218] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:49 AM]

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2626215] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:49 AM]

#3

(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2610296] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:06 PM]

#10

(#10) ORDER, dated 08/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/26/2019, unless Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2624129] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:20 PM]

1 #2

Case FILED

#8

(#8) LETTER, dated 08/02/2019, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, informing the Court that the New York City Law Department will not be representing the Defendant-Appellee, RECEIVED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2623507] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/02/2019 04:27 PM]

6 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CURED DEFECTIVE Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [ # 13 ],[ # 13 ], on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED.[2626233] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for summary reversal, on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2626232] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:54 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2626218] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. Service date 08/06/2019 by US mail.[2626215] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/07/2019 10:49 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER, dated 08/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/26/2019, unless Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2624129] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER, dated 08/05/2019, dismissing appeal by 08/26/2019, unless Appellant Mohammed Ariff Saidin, submits an Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2624110] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/05/2019 12:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER, dated 08/02/2019, on behalf of Appellee City of New York, informing the Court that the New York City Law Department will not be representing the Defendant-Appellee, RECEIVED. Service date 08/02/2019 by US mail.[2623507] [19-2146] [Entered: 08/02/2019 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2610307] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2610306] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:37 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in form pauperis, [4], on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2610303] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:24 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#4) MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. Service date 06/12/2019 by US mail.[2610297] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2610296] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/14/2019, RECEIVED.[2610295] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Mohammad Ariff Saidin, FILED. [2610292] [19-2146] [Entered: 07/16/2019 06:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.