This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/04/2021 at 06:10:26 (UTC).

Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe, et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mic

Case Summary

On 03/05/2021 Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe, filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Mic. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Sixth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-1226

  • Filing Date:

    03/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

WELFARE BENEFIT PLAN

SAGINAW CHIPPEWA INDIAN TRIBE OF MICHIGAN

Defendant / Appellee

BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MICHIGAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Herman Daniel Hofman

Attorney at Varnum

P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Perrin Rynders

Attorney at Varnum

P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Abigail Behr Molitor

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Tacy Fletcher Flint

Attorney at Sidley Austin

One S. Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60603

Phillip J. DeRosier

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

Rebecca B. Shafer

Attorney at Sidley Austin

1 S. Dearborn Street, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60603

 

Court Documents

#1

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#15

#17

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) APPELLANT BRIEF filed by Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan. Certificate of Service: 05/03/2021. Argument Request: requested. [21-1226] (HDH) [Entered: 05/03/2021 11:20 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • Docket(#16) Mediation Office is no longer involved in this appeal. (MLB) [Entered: 03/31/2021 02:52 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) BRIEFING LETTER SENT setting briefing schedule: appellant brief due 05/03/2021; appellee brief due 06/02/2021. (REO) [Entered: 03/24/2021 11:34 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • Docket(#14) TRANSCRIPT ORDER filed - no hearings held in District Court. Filed by Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan. Certificate of Service: 03/24/2021. [21-1226] (HDH) [Entered: 03/24/2021 09:18 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Rebecca B. Shafer. Certificate of Service: 03/18/2021. [21-1226] (RBS) [Entered: 03/18/2021 05:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Phillip J. DeRosier. Certificate of Service: 03/17/2021. [21-1226] (PJD) [Entered: 03/17/2021 04:11 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Ms. Tacy Fletcher Flint for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan Certificate of Service: 03/17/2021. [21-1226] (TFF) [Entered: 03/17/2021 11:40 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT OF PARTIES AND ISSUES filed by Attorney Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Appellants Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan.. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1226] (HDH) [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:26 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Attorney Mr. Herman Daniel Hofman for Appellants Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1226] (HDH) [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:25 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan by Herman D. Hofman. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1226] (HDH) [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPEARANCE filed for Appellants Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan by Perrin Rynders. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1226] (PR) [Entered: 03/12/2021 02:20 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Abigail B. Molitor. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1226] (ABM) [Entered: 03/12/2021 01:18 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPEARANCE filed for Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Michigan by Tacy F. Flint. Certificate of Service: 03/12/2021. [21-1226] (TFF) [Entered: 03/12/2021 01:14 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MEDIATOR-INITIATED CALL: A Telephone Mediation conference has been scheduled for 03/31/2021 at 9:30 am EASTERN TIME with Scott Coburn. [Please open notice for important details and deadlines.] (CAW) [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:31 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • Docket(#3) Mediation Office is involved in this appeal. (CAW) [Entered: 03/08/2021 02:29 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • Docket(#2) The case manager for this case is: Ryan Orme (REO) [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:05 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellants Saginaw Chippewa Indian Tribe of Michigan and Welfare Benefit Plan. Transcript needed: y. (REO) [Entered: 03/05/2021 10:03 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less