This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2019 at 06:00:57 (UTC).

Sacilowski v. Saul

Case Summary

On 07/15/2019 Sacilowski filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1712

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

ANDREW M. SAUL, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellee

AMANDA SACILOWSKI

Interested Party

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant and Interested Party Attorneys

Lisa G. Smoller

Attorney at Social Security Administration

Jfk Federal Bldg, Rm 625, 15 New Sudbury St

Boston, MA 02203-0000

Natasha Oeltjen

Attorney at Social Security Administration

Jfk Federal Bldg, Rm 625, 15 New Sudbury St

Boston, MA 02203-0000

Donald Campbell Lockhart

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

50 Kennedy Plaza, 8Th Flr

Providence, RI 02903-0000

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorney

Stephen P. Maguire

Attorney at Law Office of Stephen P. Maguire

41 Auburn St

Cranston, RI 02910

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Andrew M. Saul. Brief due 10/04/2019 for appellant Andrew M. Saul. Appendix due 10/04/2019 for appellant Andrew M. Saul. [19-1712] (CP) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:03 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Restricted Document #1

Abbreviated Record

Open Restricted Document #2

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Restricted Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Restricted Document #1

Appellant's Briefing Notice

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Andrew M. Saul. Brief due 10/04/2019 for appellant Andrew M. Saul. Appendix due 10/04/2019 for appellant Andrew M. Saul. [19-1712] (CP) [Entered: 08/23/2019 12:03 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Andrew M. Saul. Certificate of service dated 08/23/2019. [19-1712] (LGS) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Amanda Sacilowski filed by Attorney Stephen P. Maguire, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 08/21/2019. [19-1712] (SPM) [Entered: 08/21/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 09/04/2019 for appellant Andrew M. Saul. Appendix due 09/04/2019 for appellant Andrew M. Saul. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [19-1712] (CP) [Entered: 07/26/2019 03:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Andrew M. Saul indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2019. [19-1712] (LGS) [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:11 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Andrew M. Saul. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2019. [19-1712] (LGS) [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:09 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Andrew M. Saul filed by Attorney Lisa G. Smoller. Certificate of service dated 07/26/2019. [19-1712] (LGS) [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:08 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #30) filed by Appellant Andrew M. Saul. Docketing Statement due 07/29/2019. Transcript Report/Order form due 07/29/2019. Appearance form due 07/29/2019. [19-1712] (CP) [Entered: 07/15/2019 03:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.