This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 06:05:33 (UTC).

Ruth Richards v. Jennifer Gelsomino

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 Ruth Richards filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Jennifer Gelsomino. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-7044

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

Ruth E. Richards

Defendant / Appellee

Jennifer Gelsomino, Metropolitan Police Department Officer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

William Bradley Nes

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Dennis A. Corkery

Attorney at Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights & Urban Affairs

700 14Th Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Loren L. AliKhan

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, District of Columbia

441 4Th Street, Nw, One Judiciary Square, Sixth Floor

Washington, DC 20001-2714

Caroline S. Van Zile

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia

441 4Th Street, Nw, Suite 630 South

Washington, DC 20001

Lucy E. Pittman

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General, District of Columbia

441 4Th Street, Nw, One Judiciary Square, Sixth Floor

Washington, DC 20001-2714

 

Court Documents

Open Document

STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1796684] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 07/10/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 07/10/2019 04:25 PM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795898] filed by W Brad Nes and co-counsel Dennis A. Corkery on behalf of Appellant Ruth E. Richards. [19-7044] (Corkery, Dennis) [Entered: 07/05/2019 11:48 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793127] filed by Lucy E. Pittman and co-counsel Caroline S. Van Zile and Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellee Jennifer Gelsomino. [19-7044] (Pittman, Lucy) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:39 PM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793124] filed by Jennifer Gelsomino [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Pittman, Lucy) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:36 PM]

Open Document #2

Memorandum Opinion

Open Document #1

Underlying Decision in Case Filed

Open Document

STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1793068] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:48 AM]

Open Document

CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793067] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:46 AM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1793064] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:44 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING STATEMENT [1793058] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:35 AM]

Open Document

ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793053] filed by W. Brad Nes on behalf of Appellant Ruth E. Richards. [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:32 AM]

Open Document

CLERK'S ORDER [1788083] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/01/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/17/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/17/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/17/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/01/2019 [19-7044] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:37 AM]

Open Document

NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788081] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01002-JDB filed by Ruth E. Richards. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7044. [19-7044] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:36 AM]

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1796684] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 07/10/2019 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 07/10/2019 04:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1795898] filed by W Brad Nes and co-counsel Dennis A. Corkery on behalf of Appellant Ruth E. Richards. [19-7044] (Corkery, Dennis) [Entered: 07/05/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793127] filed by Lucy E. Pittman and co-counsel Caroline S. Van Zile and Loren L. AliKhan on behalf of Appellee Jennifer Gelsomino. [19-7044] (Pittman, Lucy) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793124] filed by Jennifer Gelsomino [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Pittman, Lucy) [Entered: 06/17/2019 02:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1793071] submitted by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1793068] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:48 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1793067] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1793064] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:44 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING STATEMENT [1793058] filed by Ruth E. Richards [Service Date: 06/17/2019 ] [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1793053] filed by W. Brad Nes on behalf of Appellant Ruth E. Richards. [19-7044] (Nes, William) [Entered: 06/17/2019 11:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S ORDER [1788083] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT statement of issues due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT underlying decision due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT transcript status report due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT procedural motions due 06/17/2019. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 07/01/2019; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 06/17/2019. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 06/17/2019. APPELLEE procedural motions due 06/17/2019. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 07/01/2019 [19-7044] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEAL [1788081] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:16-cv-01002-JDB filed by Ruth E. Richards. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 19-7044. [19-7044] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • PRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [19-7044] [Entered: 05/16/2019 10:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.