This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 04/14/2020 at 06:35:57 (UTC).

Russomano, et al v. Novo Nordisk Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 Russomano filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Novo Nordisk Inc. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-1173

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellant

NOVO NORDISK INC.

3Rd Party Defendant

BIOMARIN PHARMACEUTICAL, INC.

Plaintiff / Appellee

THOMAS A. RUSSOMANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

David A. McMamus

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Bryan M. Connor

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Bryan M. Killian

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1111 Pennsylvania Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2541

Siobhan E. Mee

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Thomas A. Linthorst

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540-0000

S. Elaine McChesney

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Sarah J. Butson

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

1 Federal St

Boston, MA 02110-1726

Jason J. Ranjo

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

502 Carnegie Center

Princeton, NJ 08540-0000

3Rd Party Defendant and Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Michael Morrison

Attorney at Jones Day

100 High St, 21St Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1781

Jenna LaPointe

Attorney at Jones Day

100 High St, 21St Flr

Boston, MA 02110-1781

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document #1

Abbreviated Record

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2020
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of reply brief [ # 6326341-2 ] submitted by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc. [20-1173] (ATC) [Entered: 03/24/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY BRIEF filed by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc.. Certificate of service dated 03/20/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 04/03/2020 . [20-1173] (LIM) [Entered: 03/20/2020 03:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc.. [20-1173] (SEM) [Entered: 03/20/2020 01:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNINE (9) paper copies of appellee/respondent brief [ # 6324601-2 ] submitted by Appellees BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Thomas A. Russomano. [20-1173] (DK) [Entered: 03/20/2020 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER directing Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc. to file a conforming reply brief. Reply brief due 03/26/2020 for appellant Novo Nordisk Inc. [20-1173] (GRC) [Entered: 03/19/2020 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc.. [20-1173] (SEM) [Entered: 03/19/2020 11:52 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge; Sandra L. Lynch, Appellate Judge and William J. Kayatta, Jr., Appellate Judge: The motion of defendant Novo Nordisk Inc. for an injunction pending appeal is denied. [20-1173] (GRC) [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Thomas A. Russomano. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2020. [20-1173] (LIM) [Entered: 03/13/2020 04:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLEES' BRIEF filed by Appellees BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Thomas A. Russomano. Certificate of service dated 03/13/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 03/20/2020 . [20-1173] (LIM) [Entered: 03/13/2020 04:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellees BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc. and Thomas A. Russomano. [20-1173] (CMM) [Entered: 03/13/2020 02:51 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 03/02/2020 . [20-1173] (LIM) [Entered: 02/24/2020 11:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: We have considered Appellant's Motion for Expedited Briefing and Oral Argument. The motion is granted as follows: Appellant's tendered brief, if compliant, will be accepted for filing. Appellee shall file a response brief on or before March 13, 2020; appellant shall file its reply on or before March 20, 2020. We contemplate scheduling argument in this matter for the May sitting. No extensions should be expected. [20-1173] (GRC) [Entered: 02/24/2020 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBRIEF tendered by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc.. [20-1173] (SEM) [Entered: 02/21/2020 05:50 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY filed by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc. to response [ # 6318762-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 02/21/2020. [20-1173] (SEM) [Entered: 02/21/2020 05:44 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE filed by Appellee Thomas A. Russomano to motion [ # 6318484-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 02/20/2020. [20-1173] (CMM) [Entered: 02/20/2020 05:09 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Thomas A. Russomano and BioMarin Pharmaceutical, Inc. filed by Attorney Christopher M. Morrison. Certificate of service dated 02/20/2020. [20-1173] (CMM) [Entered: 02/20/2020 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION to expedite Briefing and Oral Argument filed by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc.. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2020. [20-1173] (SEM) [Entered: 02/19/2020 06:41 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc. filed by Attorney Bryan M. Killian. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2020. [20-1173] (BMK) [Entered: 02/19/2020 06:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc. filed by Attorney S. Elaine McChesney. Certificate of service dated 02/19/2020. [20-1173] (SEM) [Entered: 02/19/2020 06:29 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #39) filed by Appellant Novo Nordisk Inc.. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 02/28/2020. [20-1173] (DPO) [Entered: 02/14/2020 03:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BIOMARIN PHARMACEUTICAL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NOVO NORDISK INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jenna LaPointe

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher M. Morrison