This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/17/2021 at 06:11:07 (UTC).

Rucker v. Saul

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 Rucker filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Saul. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-621

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

Jessica Rucker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Christopher Lewis Potter Esq.

Attorney at United States Social Security Administration

625 John F. Kennedy Federal Building, 15 New Sudbury Street

Boston, MA 02203

Karen Folster Lesperance Esq.

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Northern District of New York

445 Broadway

Albany, NY 12207

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Peter A. Gorton Esq.

Attorney at Lachman & Gorton

1500 East Main Street, P.O. Box 89

Endicott, NY 13761

 

Court Documents

#24

#21

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#14

RESTRICTED

13 #7

Supporting Document

13 #6

Supporting Document

13 #5

Supporting Document

13 #4

Supporting Document

13 #3

Supporting Document

13 #2

Supporting Document

13 #1

Form C FILED

#12

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

5 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

5 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Jessica Rucker Brief due date as 06/25/2021 FILED.[3065538] [21-621] [Entered: 03/29/2021 12:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, ASSIGNED.[3065474] [21-621] [Entered: 03/29/2021 12:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Jessica Rucker, informing Court of proposed due date 06/24/2021, RECEIVED. Service date 03/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3064318] [21-621] [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:34 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Jessica Rucker, FILED. Service date 03/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3064316] [21-621] [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:33 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Jessica Rucker, FILED. Service date 03/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3064313] [21-621] [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Jessica Rucker, FILED. Service date 03/26/2021 by CM/ECF.[3064299] [21-621] [Entered: 03/26/2021 10:24 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY, Christopher Lewis Potter for Andrew Saul, in case 21-621, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[3061048] [21-621] [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:07 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 03/21/2021 by CM/ECF. [3061044] [21-621] [Entered: 03/22/2021 02:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY, Karen Folster Lesperance, [ # 8 ], in place of attorney Steven D. Clymer, SUBSTITUTED.[3060619] [21-621] [Entered: 03/22/2021 08:35 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Andrew Saul, FILED. Service date 03/19/2021 by CM/ECF. [3060413] [21-621] [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3060154] [21-621] [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/02/2021, RECEIVED.[3060151] [21-621] [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 03/02/2021, RECEIVED.[3060150] [21-621] [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Jessica Rucker, FILED. [3060147] [21-621] [Entered: 03/19/2021 01:42 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter A. Gorton