This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2020 at 05:18:39 (UTC).

Ruben Juarez-Ortiz v. William Barr

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Ruben Juarez-Ortiz filed an Other lawsuit against William Barr. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-72219

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner

RUBEN JUAREZ-ORTIZ

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Respondent

WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ruben Juarez-Ortiz

357 S. Mallard Street

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Respondent Attorney

OIL

Attorney at DOJ - U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 878, Benjamin Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

1 #4

Petitoin for Review and Motion for Stay of Removal

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FILED BIA Petition for Review and Motion for Stay. PRO SE. Pursuant to G.O. 6.4(c) A TEMPORARY STAY OF REMOVAL IS IN EFFECT pending further order. Petitioner detained? NO. Certified Administrative Record due 08/31/2020. Response to motion for stay due 09/21/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Petitioner opening brief due 10/30/2020 for Ruben Juarez-Ortiz. Respondent brief due 12/29/2020 for William P. Barr, Attorney General. Optional reply brief is due 21 days from service of respondent brief. [11767410][COURT UPDATE: New Documents Attached, resent NDA,--[Edited 07/28/2020 by BY] (JBS) [Entered: 07/27/2020 01:40 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less