Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 12/16/2019 at 06:10:59 (UTC).

Roxanne King, et al v. Parker Marcy, et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 Roxanne King filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Parker Marcy. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-14165

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

ROXANNE KING

STACY GRADY, Individually and as Next of Friend of her Three Minor Children

Defendant / Appellees

COOPER

PARKER MARCY

D. J. WALKER

DAVID HASSLER

GARRETT WRIGHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Walter Douglas Adams

Attorney at Law Office of Walter Douglas Adams

Po Box 857

Brunswick, GA 31521-0857

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Steven Blackerby

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Richard K. Strickland

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

Sean Kenneth Scally

Attorney at Brown Readdick Bumgartner Carter Strickland & Watkins, LLP

5 Glynn Ave, Po Box 220

Brunswick, GA 31521-0220

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:00 PM]

Open Document

Appellant's brief filed by Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 11/26/2019 05:23 PM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/13/2019 03:39 PM]

Open Document

Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Walter Douglas Adams for Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 10/30/2019 05:11 PM]

Open Document

TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Walter Douglas Adams for Appellants Roxanne King and Stacy Grady. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:34 PM]

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14165] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:56 PM]

Open Document #2

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document #1

Appearance of Counsel Form Filed

Open Document

Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Walter Douglas Adams for Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:15 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Walter Douglas Adams for Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:13 PM]

Open Document

Appellate fee was paid on 10/16/2019 as to Appellant Stacy Grady. [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:35 PM]

Open Document #4

USDC Judgment- Doc #80

Open Document #3

USDC Order- Doc #75

Open Document #2

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

Open Document #1

DKT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • Received paper copies of EAppendix filed by Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. 1 VOLUMES - 2 COPIES [Entered: 12/09/2019 11:05 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • Received paper copies of EBrief filed by Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appendix filed [1 VOLUMES] by Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 12/03/2019 02:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellant's brief filed by Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 11/26/2019 05:23 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 11/26/2019 12:46 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Briefing Notice issued to Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. The appellant's brief is due on or before 11/26/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. [Entered: 11/13/2019 03:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • ORIGINAL PAPERS filed. Record Part: Exhibit Envelope, No. of Volumes: 1 [Entered: 11/05/2019 07:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Walter Douglas Adams for Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 10/30/2019 05:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION form filed by Attorney Walter Douglas Adams for Appellants Roxanne King and Stacy Grady. No transcript is required for appeal purposes. [Entered: 11/13/2019 12:34 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14165] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Richard K. Strickland for Cooper, David Hassler, Parker Marcy, D. J. Walker and Garrett Wright and Steven Blackerby for Cooper, David Hassler, Parker Marcy, D. J. Walker and Garrett Wright. [19-14165] (ECF: Richard Strickland) [Entered: 10/25/2019 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Walter Douglas Adams for Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:15 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Walter Douglas Adams for Stacy Grady and Roxanne King. [19-14165] (ECF: Walter Adams) [Entered: 10/25/2019 12:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Appellate fee was paid on 10/16/2019 as to Appellant Stacy Grady. [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellants Stacy Grady and Roxanne King on 10/16/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 10/31/2019 as to Appellant Stacy Grady. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/14/2019 as to Appellee Cooper [Entered: 10/22/2019 02:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Cooper Companies, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven G. Blackerby

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean Kenneth Scally

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard K. Strickland