This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2019 at 06:05:34 (UTC).

Rover Pipeline LLC v. Rover Tract No. PA WA HL-004.5, et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2019 Rover Pipeline LLC filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against Rover Tract No PA WA HL-004 5. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1613

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

 

Party Details

Defendants

FRED C. STROUD

BARBARA MINGES SHEPERD

PNC MORTGAGE, a division of PNC Bank, Nation Association

TALISMAN ENERGY USA INC

COLUMBIA GAS TRANSMISSION LLC, c/o Corporation Service Company

LAVERNE D. MEDINA

LUCILLE D. FROATS

VALVOLINE OIL CO

MURDOCKSVILLE INDEPENDENT TELEPHONE CO

WEST PENN POWER CO, doing business as Allegheny Power

ELYSIA ORISON SMITH

DAVID J. RHEINLANDER, and

PATRICIA R. SHOOP MINGES

ROCCO ZAGARI, JR., and

WCM PROPERTIES LLC

CAPITAL C ENERGY OPERATIONS LP

Defendant / Appellees and Defendants

JAMES M. BUCHANAN AND DIANE ZACK BUCHANAN FARM #4 LP, and

PEOPLES NATURAL GAS CO, c/o Corporation Service Company

DAVID J. RHEINLANDER, and

GRETCHEN RHEINLANDER, husband and wife

Plaintiff / Appellant

ROVER PIPELINE LLC

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee and Defendant Attorneys

Jordan Walker Esq.

Attorney at Sever Storey

881 3Rd Avenue, S.W., Suite 101

Carmel, IN 46032

Harry F. Kunselman Esq.

Attorney at Strassburger McKenna Gutnick & Gefsky

444 Liberty Avenue, Suite 2200, Four Gateway Center

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Peter H. Schnore Esq.

Attorney at Babst Calland

Two Gateway Center, 6Th Floor, 603 Stanwix Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Lori A. Dawkins Esq.

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

600 17Th Street, Suite 2300 South

Denver, CO 80202

Brian J. Pulito Esq.

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

201 Chestnut Street, Suite 200

Meadville, PA 16335

Jon C. Beckman Esq.

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson

201 Chestnut Street, Suite 200

Meadville, PA 16335

Thomas A. Zabel Esq.

Attorney at Zabel Freeman

1135 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77008

Vadim O. Bourenin Esq.

Attorney at Zabel Freeman

1135 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77008

Nancy H. Elliott Esq.

Attorney at Zabel Freeman

1135 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77008

Other Attorneys

Lawrence E. Bolind Esq. Jr.

238 Main Street

Imperial, PA 15126

Amy J. Coles Esq.

Attorney at Blank Rome

501 Grant Street, Suite 850

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

 

Court Documents

Open Restricted Document #2

Mediation Notice of Assignment Telephone

Open Restricted Document #1

Mediation Instructions

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harry F. Kunselman on behalf of Appellee(s) ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-004.500T. [19-1613] (HFK) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:45 PM]

Open Document

FOLLOW UP LETTER to Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr., Esq. for Old Wilson Farm Land Trust, Amy J. Coles, Esq. for Verizon Pennsylvania LLC, Harry F. Kunselman, Esq. for Rover Tract No. PA WA HL-004.500T, James M. Buchanan and Diane Zack Buchanan Farm #4 LP and Rover Tract No. PA WA HL-008.000T and Peter H. Schnore, Esq. for Peoples Natural Gas Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/08/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 05/08/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:59 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jon C. Beckman on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (BJP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:52 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee James M. Buchanan and Diane Zack Buchanan Farm #4 LP, filed. [19-1613] (HFK) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:47 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harry F. Kunselman on behalf of Appellee(s) James M. Buchanan and Diane Zack Buchanan Farm #4 LP. [19-1613] (HFK) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:45 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian J. Pulito on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (BJP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:59 AM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC, filed. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:26 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC, received. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:19 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/04/2019 12:01 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC, filed. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/04/2019 12:00 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vadim O. Bourenin on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:56 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas A. Zabel on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:54 PM]

Open Document

ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nancy H. Elliott on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:53 PM]

Open Document #7

Case Opening Letter

Open Document #5

Case Caption

Open Document #4

DC Judgment dated 022119

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 05/24/2019 03:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harry F. Kunselman on behalf of Appellee(s) ROVER TRACT NO. PA-WA-HL-004.500T. [19-1613] (HFK) [Entered: 04/25/2019 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FOLLOW UP LETTER to Lawrence E. Bolind, Jr., Esq. for Old Wilson Farm Land Trust, Amy J. Coles, Esq. for Verizon Pennsylvania LLC, Harry F. Kunselman, Esq. for Rover Tract No. PA WA HL-004.500T, James M. Buchanan and Diane Zack Buchanan Farm #4 LP and Rover Tract No. PA WA HL-008.000T and Peter H. Schnore, Esq. for Peoples Natural Gas Co requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 05/08/2019. Disclosure Statement on or before 05/08/2019. (PDB) [Entered: 04/24/2019 02:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jon C. Beckman on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (BJP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 01:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellee James M. Buchanan and Diane Zack Buchanan Farm #4 LP, filed. [19-1613] (HFK) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Harry F. Kunselman on behalf of Appellee(s) James M. Buchanan and Diane Zack Buchanan Farm #4 LP. [19-1613] (HFK) [Entered: 04/09/2019 09:45 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Brian J. Pulito on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (BJP) [Entered: 04/09/2019 08:59 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: CIVIL INFORMATION STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC, filed. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/08/2019 02:26 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC, received. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:19 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Transcript Purchase Order Form (Part 1) filed by Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC advising this court that transcripts are already on file in the District Court. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/04/2019 12:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT on behalf of Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC, filed. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 04/04/2019 12:00 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Vadim O. Bourenin on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Thomas A. Zabel on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:54 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Nancy H. Elliott on behalf of Appellant(s) Rover Pipeline LLC. [19-1613] (NHE) [Entered: 03/27/2019 04:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:17 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Rover Pipeline LLC in District Court No. 2-17-cv-00170. (PDB) [Entered: 03/26/2019 12:14 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TALISMAN ENERGY USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where VALVOLINE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC MORTGAGE is a litigant