This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:04:30 (UTC).

Routt v. Hansford

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Routt filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hansford. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-5067

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellees

DUSTIN HANSFORD

JOSHUA LANKFORD

ARAMARK CORPORATION

Plaintiff / Appellant

JOHN STEPHEN ROUTT

Lawton, OK 73501-9700

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

John Stephen Routt

Attorney at Lawton Correctional Facility

8607 Se Flower Mound Road

Lawton, OK 73501-9700

 

Court Documents

Open Document

[10663875] Order filed by Clerk of the Court lifting the abatement of this appeal and directing appellant file pay the appellate filing fee or file an IFP motion and file his opening brief by 08/26/2019. Served on 07/17/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-5067] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:38 PM]

Open Document #2

Response letter

Open Document

[10665369] District court order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. The district court did not do an order assessing fees. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/24/2019 10:32 AM]

Open Document #2

New General Dkt Letter - Pro Se

Open Document

[10663769] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: district court order denying motion to reconsider. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:18 PM]

Open Document

[10670153] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying Appellant's motion to appoint attorney filed by John Stephen Routt. Served on 08/13/2019. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/13/2019 07:57 AM]

Open Document

[10670132] Appellant's motion filed by John Stephen Routt to appoint counsel. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/13/2019 07:32 AM]

Open Document

[10666586] Entry of appearance filed by John Stephen Routt. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/24/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-5067] [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:22 PM]

Open Document

[10663496] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case pending the district court's disposition of the motion docketed as ECF No. 11. Status report due 08/15/2019 by John Stephen Routt. Once the district court has ruled on ECF No. 11: the clerk of the district court shall supplement the preliminary record. Served on 07/16/2019. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:53 PM]

Open Document #1

Miscellaneous correspondence

Open Document

[10670157] Order filed by Clerk of the Court assessing costs and fees in the amount of $505. Served on 08/13/2019. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/13/2019 08:04 AM]

Open Document

[10665051] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1 pleadings. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:20 AM]

Open Restricted Document

RESTRICTED

Open Document

[10674182] Appellant brief filed by John Stephen Routt. Served on 08/21/2019 by.. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:27 PM]

Open Document #1

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10674182] Appellant brief filed by John Stephen Routt. Served on 08/21/2019 by.. Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? y. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/28/2019 12:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670157] Order filed by Clerk of the Court assessing costs and fees in the amount of $505. Served on 08/13/2019. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/13/2019 08:04 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670153] Order filed by Judge Tymkovich denying Appellant's motion to appoint attorney filed by John Stephen Routt. Served on 08/13/2019. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/13/2019 07:57 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670137] Appellant's motion filed by John Stephen Routt for leave to proceed without prepayment of costs and fees. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/13/2019 07:38 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10670132] Appellant's motion filed by John Stephen Routt to appoint counsel. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-5067] [Entered: 08/13/2019 07:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10666586] Entry of appearance filed by John Stephen Routt. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/24/2019. Manner of Service: US mail [19-5067] [Entered: 07/29/2019 04:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665369] District court order granting leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. The district court did not do an order assessing fees. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/24/2019 10:32 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10665051] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Volume 1 pleadings. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:20 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10664795] Miscellaneous correspondence received from John Stephen Routt but not filed. (Response letter sent.) [19-5067] [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • [10663876] Jurisdictional review complete. (Deadlines were set per the 7/17/16 order.) [19-5067] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663875] Order filed by Clerk of the Court lifting the abatement of this appeal and directing appellant file pay the appellate filing fee or file an IFP motion and file his opening brief by 08/26/2019. Served on 07/17/2019. (See the attachment for the entire order.) [19-5067] [Entered: 07/17/2019 04:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663769] Supplemental preliminary record filed. Contents: district court order denying motion to reconsider. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/17/2019 02:18 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663496] Order filed by Clerk of the Court abating case pending the district court's disposition of the motion docketed as ECF No. 11. Status report due 08/15/2019 by John Stephen Routt. Once the district court has ruled on ECF No. 11: the clerk of the district court shall supplement the preliminary record. Served on 07/16/2019. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:53 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • [10663336] Prisoner case docketed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/15/2019. Fee or 1915 forms due 08/15/2019 for John Stephen Routt. Notice of appearance due on 08/15/2019 for John Stephen Routt. [19-5067] [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:46 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.