This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2019 at 06:05:39 (UTC).

Ross v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 Ross filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-72

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Second Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendant / Appellee

Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff / Appellant

Daisy Worrell Ross, For Ernell E. Worrell

Brooklyn, NY 11231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant / Appellee Attorney

Candace Scott Appleton

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of New York

271 Cadman Plaza East

Brooklyn, NY 11201

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Daisy Worrell Ross

470 Columbia Street, Apt. 3E

Brooklyn, NY 11231

 

Court Documents

#5

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

12 #2

Declaration of Service

#10

RESTRICTED

#21

RESTRICTED

#22

(#22) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross Brief due date as 04/30/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/30/2019, copy to pro se Appellant, FILED.[2507483] [19-72] [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:02 AM]

4 #1

Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed

#8

RESTRICTED

#1

Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax

4 #2

Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED

12 #1

Notice of Appearance for Additional or Substitute Counsel FILED

#3

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Case FILED

#2

RESTRICTED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross Brief due date as 04/30/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 04/30/2019, copy to pro se Appellant, FILED.[2507483] [19-72] [Entered: 02/28/2019 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross, informing Court of proposed due date 04/30/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2507075] [19-72] [Entered: 02/27/2019 05:01 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NEW CASE MANAGER, Elizabeth Munoz, copy to Pro Se Appellant, ASSIGNED.[2486936] [19-72] [Entered: 01/31/2019 05:38 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ATTORNEY, Candace Scott Appleton, [ # 12 ], in place of attorney Varuni Nelson, SUBSTITUTED.[2484882] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:56 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill, FILED. Service date 01/29/2019 by US mail. [2484866] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 04:47 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE, to Appellee Nancy A. Berryhill, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2484233] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:39 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross, FILED. Service date 01/19/2019 by US mail.[2484228] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Daisy Worrell Ross, FILED. Service date 01/19/2019 by US mail.[2484224] [19-72] [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:36 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CAPTION, updated party text, AMENDED.[2476199] [19-72] [Entered: 01/16/2019 10:28 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2471106] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:59 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2471105] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:58 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 11/29/2018, RECEIVED.[2471102] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:57 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 11/28/2018, RECEIVED.[2471100] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Daisy Worrell Ross, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2471053] [19-72] [Entered: 01/09/2019 12:33 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.