This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 05/23/2020 at 19:45:40 (UTC).

Rosalie Simon, et al v. Republic of Hungary, et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Rosalie Simon filed an Other lawsuit against Republic of Hungary. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, D.C. Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    20-7025

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellees

Ella Feuerstein Schlanger, Individually, for themselves and for all others similarly situated

Moshe Perel

Asher Yogev, In His Capacity As Heir At Law To Tzvi Zelikovitch, Deceased

Ze'ev Tibi Ram

Rose Miller

Esther Zelikovitch, In Her Capacity As Heir At Law to Tzvi Zelikovitch, Deceased

Yitzhak Pressburger

Magda Kopolovich Bar-Or

Zehava (Olga) Friedman

Yosef Yogev, In His Capacity As Heir At Law to Tzvi Zelikovitch, Deceased

Tzvi Zelikovitch

Rosalie Simon

Vera Deutsch Danos

Alexander Speiser

Helena Weksberg

Helen Herman

Charlotte Weiss

Defendant / Appellants

Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt., (MAV ZRT.)

Republic of Hungary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellee Attorneys

Charles Samuel Fax

Attorney at Rifkin, Livingston, Levitan & Silver, LLC

7979 Old Georgetown Road, Suite 400

Bethesda, MD 20814

David H. Weinstein

Attorney at Weinstein Kitchenoff & Asher LLC

100 South Broad Street, Suite 705

Philadelphia, PA 19110

Liesel Johanna Schopler

Attorney at Rifkin, Weiner, Livingston, Levitan & Silver, LLC

225 Duke Of Gloucester Street

Annapolis, MD 21401

L. Marc Zell Esquire

Attorney at Zell, Aron & Co.

Paul G. Gaston

Attorney at Law Office of Paul G. Gaston

1901 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 607

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant / Appellant Attorneys

Konrad L. Cailteux

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

Gregory Stewart Silbert

Attorney at Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP

767 Fifth Avenue

New York, NY 10153

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

form(s) sent

Open Document #1

Order Sent

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document

Open Document #2

Attachment 1 - Docket

Open Document #1

Docketing Statement Filed

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2 - Order

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1 - Memorandum Opinion

Open Document #1

Certificate as to Parties, Rulings and Related Cases Filed

Open Document

Open Document

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1843460] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 06/29/2020. APPENDIX due 06/29/2020. APPELLEE Brief due on 07/29/2020. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 08/19/2020 [20-7025] [Entered: 05/19/2020 12:15 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1839569] filed by Magda Kopolovich Bar-Or, Helen Herman, Zehava (Olga) Friedman, Vera Deutsch Danos, Rose Miller, Moshe Perel, Yitzhak Pressburger, Ze'ev Tibi Ram, Ella Feuerstein Schlanger, Rosalie Simon, Alexander Speiser, Charlotte Weiss, Helena Weksberg, Asher Yogev, Yosef Yogev, Esther Zelikovitch and Tzvi Zelikovitch [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] [20-7025] (Fax, Charles) [Entered: 04/23/2020 03:23 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1839531] submitted by Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] [20-7025] (Cailteux, Konrad) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:04 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1839529] filed by Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [20-7025] (Cailteux, Konrad) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:02 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF ISSUES [1839526] filed by Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] [20-7025] (Cailteux, Konrad) [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:49 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1839525] filed by Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] Intent: AppxNotDeferred [20-7025] (Cailteux, Konrad) [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:48 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1839524] filed by Konrad L. Cailteux and co-counsel Gregory S. Silbert on behalf of Appellants Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary. [20-7025] (Cailteux, Konrad) [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:46 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCKETING STATEMENT [1839523] filed by Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] [20-7025] (Cailteux, Konrad) [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:41 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1839520] filed by Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 04/23/2020 ] [20-7025] (Cailteux, Konrad) [Entered: 04/23/2020 12:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1836498] filed by Charles S. Fax and co-counsel Liesel J. Schopler, Lawrence Marc Zell, Paul G. Gaston, David H. Weinstein on behalf of Appellees Magda Kopolovich Bar-Or, Vera Deutsch Danos, Zehava (Olga) Friedman, Helen Herman, Rose Miller, Moshe Perel, Yitzhak Pressburger, Ze'ev Tibi Ram, Ella Feuerstein Schlanger, Rosalie Simon, Alexander Speiser, Charlotte Weiss, Helena Weksberg, Asher Yogev, Yosef Yogev, Esther Zelikovitch and Tzvi Zelikovitch. [20-7025] (Fax, Charles) [Entered: 04/02/2020 01:32 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S ORDER [1835041] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT statement of issues due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT underlying decision due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT transcript status report due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT procedural motions due 04/23/2020. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/08/2020; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 04/23/2020. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 04/23/2020. APPELLEE procedural motions due 04/23/2020. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/08/2020 [20-7025] [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEAL [1835035] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:10-cv-01770-BAH filed by Magyar Allamvasutak Zrt. and Republic of Hungary. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 20-7025. [20-7025] [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:07 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketPRIVATE CIVIL CASE docketed. [20-7025] [Entered: 03/24/2020 03:06 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Stewart Silbert(Designation Retained)