This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 02/19/2022 at 06:11:34 (UTC).

Ronald Strasser, Jr. v. State of Oregon, et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Ronald Strasser, Jr filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against State of Oregon. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-36044

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellant

RONALD KENNETH STRASSER, Jr.

Carlton, OR 97111

Defendant / Appellees

STATE OF OREGON, by and through Governor Kate Brown, in her individual capacity

KATE BROWN, in her individual capacity

SHELLEY HOFFMAN, State Risk Manager

ERIC MACHADO, Clackamas County Risk and Safety Manager

CRAIG ROBERTS, Clackamas County Sheriff, in his individual capacity

DAVE M. ELLINGTON, Clackamas County Under Sheriff, in his individual capacity

DANIEL JOSEPH O'KEEFE, Clackamas County Sheriff Deputy, in his private capacity

GREG KEPPLER, Clackamas County Sheriff Deputy, in his private capacity

KATY COBA, Department of Administrative Services

DEBBIE SPRADLEY, Trial Court Administrator

JOHN S. FOOTE, Clackamas County District Attorney

CHRISTOPHER K. HAYWOOD, Assistant D.A.

DONALD KRUPP, County Administrator

LAUREL BUTMAN, Chief Executive Officer Deputy

KEN HUMBERSTON, Commissioner

MORGAN GUTHNER, Clackamas County Sheriff Deputy, in his private capacity

DAVID O'SHAUGHNESSY, Captain, in their private capacity

COREY R. SMITH, Sergeant, in their private capacity

ROBERT HERNDON, Clackamas County Circuit Court Officer, Judge

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ronald Kenneth Strasser Jr.

C/O 151 S Scott Streetapt. 2

Carlton, OR 97111

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Jesse B. Davis

100 Sw Market Street

Portland, OR 97201

Denise Gale Fjordbeck

Attorney at Oregon Department of Justice

1162 Court Street, Ne

Salem, OR 97301

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Pro Se Case Opening Packet

1 #4

Attorneys Not Registered for E-Filing

#4

(#4) Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN, MORGAN B. CHRISTEN and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the district courts November 5, 2021 order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order disposing of fewer than all claims against all parties not immediately appealable unless district court directs entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)). DISMISSED. [12346297] (WL) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:06 PM]

#5

(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Ronald Kenneth Strasser, Jr. Motion to file late petition for rehearing and/or petition for rehearing en banc of 8 pages. Date of service: 02/11/2022. [12367224] [21-36044] (Strasser, Ronald) [Entered: 02/11/2022 03:16 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Ronald Kenneth Strasser, Jr. motion for reconsideration of dispositive Judge Order of 01/20/2022. Date of service: 02/11/2022. [12367650] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [6] .] (TYL) [Entered: 02/11/2022 11:10 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed (ECF) Appellant Ronald Kenneth Strasser, Jr. motion for reconsideration of dispositive Judge Order of 01/20/2022. Date of service: 02/11/2022. [12367650] --[COURT ENTERED FILING to correct entry [6] .] (TYL) [Entered: 02/11/2022 11:10 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • Docket(#6) COURT DELETED INCORRECT ENTRY. Notice about deletion sent to case participants registered for electronic filing. Correct Entry: [ # 7 ]. Original Text: Filed (ECF) Appellant Ronald Kenneth Strasser, Jr. petition for panel rehearing (from 01/20/2022 memorandum). Date of service: 02/11/2022. [12367225] [21-36044] (Strasser, Ronald) [Entered: 02/11/2022 03:21 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filed (ECF) Appellant Ronald Kenneth Strasser, Jr. Motion to file late petition for rehearing and/or petition for rehearing en banc of 8 pages. Date of service: 02/11/2022. [12367224] [21-36044] (Strasser, Ronald) [Entered: 02/11/2022 03:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Filed order (RICHARD C. TALLMAN, MORGAN B. CHRISTEN and JACQUELINE H. NGUYEN) A review of the record demonstrates that this court lacks jurisdiction over this appeal because the district courts November 5, 2021 order challenged in the appeal is not final or appealable. See 28 U.S.C. 1291; Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221, 222 (9th Cir. 1981) (order disposing of fewer than all claims against all parties not immediately appealable unless district court directs entry of judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b)). DISMISSED. [12346297] (WL) [Entered: 01/20/2022 03:06 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Jesse B. Davis substituted by Attorney Denise Gale Fjordbeck. [12325312] (RL) [Entered: 12/27/2021 03:04 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Denise G. Fjordbeck (Oregon Department of Justice - Appellate Division, 1162 Court Street NE, Salem, Oregon 97301) for Appellees Kate Brown, Katy Coba, Department of Public Safety Systems and Training, John S. Foote, Christopher K. Haywood, Robert Herndon, Shelley Hoffman, Jeffrey S. Jones, Thomas J. Rastetter, Debbie Spradley and State of Oregon. Substitution for Attorney Jesse B. Davis for Appellees Kate Brown, Katy Coba, Department of Public Safety Systems and Training, John S. Foote, Christopher K. Haywood, Robert Herndon, Shelley Hoffman, Jeffrey S. Jones, Thomas J. Rastetter, Debbie Spradley and State of Oregon. Date of service: 12/27/2021. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12325295] [21-36044] (Fjordbeck, Denise) [Entered: 12/27/2021 02:52 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Appellant Ronald Kenneth Strasser Jr. opening brief due 02/18/2022. Appellees All Clerks of Clackamas County Court and their associates, All other deputy's directly and indirectly involved, Ken Boell, Kate Brown, Laurel Butman, Clackamas County Sheriff's Office Professional Standard Unit, Katy Coba, DPI Security, Department of Public Safety Systems and Training, Dave M. Ellington, John S. Foote, Pat Garrett, Morgan Guthner, Christopher K. Haywood, Robert Herndon, Shelley Hoffman, Ken Humberston, John And Jane Does, Jeffrey S. Jones, Greg Keppler, Donald Krupp, Eric Machado, Joel Manley, Daniel Joseph O'Keefe, David O'Shaughnessy, Samantha Olson, Oregon State Sheriff's Association, Thomas J. Rastetter, Craig Roberts, Corey R. Smith, Dan Smith, Debbie Spradley, State of Oregon and Shane Strangfield answering brief due 03/21/2022. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12321663] (JBS) [Entered: 12/21/2021 10:27 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jesse B. Davis

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denise Gale Fjordbeck