This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2019 at 06:03:55 (UTC).

Ronald Stockton v. Secretary Pennsylvania Departm, et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2019 Ronald Stockton filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Secretary Pennsylvania Departm. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-2626

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Third Circuit

 

Party Details

Defendants

CO BAYLIST

CAPT. KNOWLES

CO HURT

D. J. CLOSE

CO DYKE

C.O. LANCASS

SUPERINTENDENT SMITH

CAPT. MILLER

SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS

CO REYMAN

SGT. MCCLARE

C.O. DUFOUR

LT. SWANSON

Plaintiff / Appellant

RONALD STOCKTON

Houtzdale, PA 16698

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorney

Ronald Stockton

Attorney at Houtzdale SCI

P.O. Box 1000

Houtzdale, PA 16698

 

Court Documents

Open Document #4

Case Opening Letter

Open Document

CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 09/05/2019. (JK) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:20 PM]

Open Document #2

District Court Order

Open Document #2

1291 Enclosure

Open Document #1

Send screening letter

Open Document #3

Case Caption

Open Document #1

Civil Case Docketed

Open Document

ECF FILER: Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General NOT PARTICIPATING: will not participate in this appeal, received. [19-2626] (SAK) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:37 AM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK ORDER dismissing case, pursuant to F.R.A.P. 3(a) and LAR 3.3 and Misc. 107.1(a), for failure to pay the filing fee for the notice of appeal. Case terminated on 09/05/2019. (JK) [Entered: 09/05/2019 12:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case has been listed for possible dismissal due to jurisdictional defect. (NF) [Entered: 07/18/2019 10:16 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ECF FILER: Pennsylvania Office of Attorney General NOT PARTICIPATING: will not participate in this appeal, received. [19-2626] (SAK) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:00 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ronald Stockton in District Court No. 3-19-cv-00742. (JK) [Entered: 07/16/2019 09:51 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.