This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 12/20/2022 at 06:01:59 (UTC).

Ron Givens, et al v. Gavin Newsom, et al

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Ron Givens, filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gavin Newsom,. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    22-16624

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

 

Party Details

Plaintiff / Appellants

RON GIVENS

CHRISTINE BISH

Defendant / Appellees

GAVIN NEWSOM, in his official capacity as the Governor of California

XAVIER BECERRA, in his official capacity as the Attorney General of California

WARREN STANLEY, in his official capacity as the Commissioner of the California Highway Patrol

SONIA Y. ANGELL, in her official capacity as the State Public Health Officer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff / Appellant Attorneys

Harmeet Dhillon Esquire

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group, Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

Mark P. Meuser

Attorney at Dhillon Law Group, Inc.

177 Post Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94108

D. Gill Sperlein

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF D. GILL SPERLEIN

345 Grove Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant / Appellee Attorneys

Todd Grabarsky

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

300 S Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

James W. Walter

Attorney at AGCA-Office of the California Attorney General

1300 I Street, Suite 125

Sacramento, CA 95814

Anna Ferrari

Attorney at California Department of Justice

455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#1

Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule

1 #2

Notice to All Parties and Counsel

1 #3

Mediation Letter

1 #4

Case Opening Packet

#2

(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Christine Bish and Ron Givens Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/27/2022. [12574282] [22-16624] (Sperlein, D.) [Entered: 10/27/2022 11:07 AM]

#6

(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Ron Givens and Christine Bish Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 12/15/2022. [12611139] [22-16624] (Meuser, Mark) [Entered: 12/15/2022 08:04 AM]

#7

(#7) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The appellants unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) to stay appellate proceedings is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed until resolution of the petition for certiorari in Brach v. Newsom, Sup. Ct. Dkt. No. 22-250, or until further order of the court. The appellants shall file a status report on March 16, 2023, and every 90 days thereafter while resolution of Brach v. Newsom is pending. Status reports should include any change in the status of Brach v. Newsom and the estimated date of resolution, if known. The appellants shall notify the court by filing a status report within 7 days of the resolution of Brach v. Newsom. Failure to file a status report may terminate the stay of appellate proceedings. The briefing schedule will be reset in a future order. [12612752] (AF) [Entered: 12/16/2022 02:38 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: TAH): The appellants unopposed motion (Docket Entry No. [ # 6 ]) to stay appellate proceedings is granted. The previously established briefing schedule is vacated. Appellate proceedings are stayed until resolution of the petition for certiorari in Brach v. Newsom, Sup. Ct. Dkt. No. 22-250, or until further order of the court. The appellants shall file a status report on March 16, 2023, and every 90 days thereafter while resolution of Brach v. Newsom is pending. Status reports should include any change in the status of Brach v. Newsom and the estimated date of resolution, if known. The appellants shall notify the court by filing a status report within 7 days of the resolution of Brach v. Newsom. Failure to file a status report may terminate the stay of appellate proceedings. The briefing schedule will be reset in a future order. [12612752] (AF) [Entered: 12/16/2022 02:38 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filed (ECF) Appellants Ron Givens and Christine Bish Unopposed Motion to stay appellate proceedings. Date of service: 12/15/2022. [12611139] [22-16624] (Meuser, Mark) [Entered: 12/15/2022 08:04 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Docket(#5) Attorney Chad Allen Stegeman substituted by Attorney Anna Ferrari, in 22-16624. [12609591] (HH) [Entered: 12/13/2022 03:08 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Docket(#4) Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Anna Theresa Ferrari (California Department of Justice, Office of the Attorney General; 455 Golden Gate Avenue, Suite 11000; San Francisco, California 94102-7004) for Appellees Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom and Warren Stanley. Substitution for Attorney Chad Allen Stegeman, Esquire for Appellees Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom and Warren Stanley. Date of service: 12/13/2022. (Party was previously proceeding with counsel.) [12609572] [22-16624] (Ferrari, Anna) [Entered: 12/13/2022 02:58 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • Docket(#3) The Mediation Questionnaire for this case was filed on 10/27/2022. To submit pertinent confidential information directly to the Circuit Mediators, please use the following # link . Confidential submissions may include any information relevant to mediation of the case and settlement potential, including, but not limited to, settlement history, ongoing or potential settlement discussions, non-litigated party related issues, other pending actions, and timing considerations that may impact mediation efforts.[12574508]. [22-16624] (AD) [Entered: 10/27/2022 12:44 PM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Filed (ECF) Appellants Christine Bish and Ron Givens Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 10/27/2022. [12574282] [22-16624] (Sperlein, D.) [Entered: 10/27/2022 11:07 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Appellants Christine Bish and Ron Givens Mediation Questionnaire due on 10/28/2022. Appellants Christine Bish and Ron Givens opening brief due 12/19/2022. Appellees Sonia Y. Angell, Xavier Becerra, Gavin Newsom and Warren Stanley answering brief due 01/18/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12570104] (JBS) [Entered: 10/21/2022 11:47 AM]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less