This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 03/25/2021 at 05:04:11 (UTC).

Roman Catholic Church, et al v. Unsecured Creditors Committee

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 Roman Catholic Church filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Unsecured Creditors Committee. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Tenth Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    21-702

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

 

Party Details

Petitioners

TRUSTEE OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF SANTA FE REAL ESTATE TRUST

ARCHDIOCESE OF SANTA FE DEPOSIT AND LOAN FUND

PARISH STEERING COMMITTEE OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF SANTA FE

ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH OF THE ARCHIDOCESE OF SANTA FE

ARCHDIOCESE OF SANTA FE REAL ESTATE CORPORATION

Respondent

OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bruce A. Anderson

Attorney at Elsaesser Anderson

320 East Neider Avenue, Suite 102

Coeur D'Alene, ID 83815

Susan M. Freeman

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

201 East Washington Street, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Hannah G. Dolski

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

201 East Washington Street, Suite 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Ford Elsaesser

Attorney at Elsaesser Anderson

320 East Neider Avenue, Suite 102

Coeur D'Alene, ID 83815

Thomas D. Walker

Attorney at Walker & Associates

500 Marquette N.W., Suite 650

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Eric Nieuwenhuis Kniffin

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

90 South Cascade Avenue, Suite 1100

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Robert M. Charles Jr.

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie

One South Church Avenue, Suite 700

Tucson, AZ 85701-1611

Respondent Attorneys

Kenneth Brown

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

150 California Street, 15Th Foor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Gail S. Greenwood

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, 11Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4100

James I. Stang

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard, 11Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4100

 

Court Documents

Open Document #1

Main Document

Open Document #2

Exhibit 1

Open Document #3

Exhibit 2

Open Document #4

Exhibit 3

Open Document #5

Exhibit 4

Open Document #6

Exhibit 5

Open Document #7

Exhibit 6

Open Document #8

Exhibit 7

Open Document #9

Misc Docket Letter

Open Document #1

Joint Stipulation

Open Document #2

Order Upon Joint Stipulation

Open Document

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817557] Order filed by Clerk of the Court granting the parties' Joint Stipulation to stay proceedings. Proceedings in this petition for permission to appeal are abated. On or before 07/01/2021, the parties shall file a status report regarding the status of their settlement discussions. See attached order. Served on 03/24/2021. [21-702] [Entered: 03/24/2021 02:55 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817297] Stipulation for stay of stay proceedings and all deadlines for 90 days filed by Archdiocese of Santa Fe Deposit and Loan Fund, Archdiocese of Santa Fe Real Estate Corporation and Parish Steering Committee of the Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of Santa Fe. Served on 03/23/2021. Manner of Service: email. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [21-702] RMC [Entered: 03/23/2021 06:05 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[10817208] Case docketed. Petition for permission to appeal under 158(d) and FRAP 5 filed. Response due on 04/02/2021 for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. DATE RECEIVED: 03/22/2021. [21-702] [Entered: 03/23/2021 02:31 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roman Catholic Church of the Archdiocese of Santa Fe is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James I Stang

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gail S Greenwood