This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2019 at 06:04:19 (UTC).

Rojas-Tapia v. US

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 Rojas-Tapia filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against US. This case was filed in U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    19-1264

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. Courts Of Appeals

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, First Circuit

 

Party Details

Petitioner / Appellant

JESUS ROJAS-TAPIA

Coleman, FL 33521-1032

Respondent / Appellee

UNITED STATES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner / Appellant Attorneys

Jesus Rojas-Tapia

Attorney at FCI Coleman Medium

Po Box 1032

Coleman, FL 33521-1032

Eric A. Vos

Attorney at Federal Public Defender Office

241 F D Roosevelt Ave, 4Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-2441

Vivianne Marie Marrero-Torres

Attorney at Federal Public Defender Office

241 F D Roosevelt Ave, 4Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-2441

Franco L. Perez-Redondo

Attorney at Federal Public Defender Office

241 F D Roosevelt Ave, 4Th Flr

San Juan, PR 00918-2441

Respondent / Appellee Attorneys

Mariana E. Bauza Almonte

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

Nelson Jose Perez-Sosa

Attorney at US Attorney's Office

350 Carlos Chardon Ave, Torre Chardon, Ste 1201

San Juan, PR 00918-0000

 

Court Documents

Open Document #2

Case Opening Notice

Open Document

ORDER granting motion to extend time to request certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 05/24/2019. [19-1264] (GK) [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:11 PM]

Open Document

NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia filed by Attorney Vivianne M. Marrero Torres. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1264] (VMM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:45 PM]

Open Document #1

Abbreviated record

Open Document #3

Notice Regarding Native PDF

Open Document

MOTION to extend time to request a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia. Certificate of service dated 04/24/2019. [19-1264] (FLP) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:10 PM]

Open Document

ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 04/24/2019. Date of denial by district court: February 27, 2019. [19-1264] (TS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:19 AM]

Open Document

DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2019. [19-1264] (VMM) [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:20 PM]

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting motion to extend time to request certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 05/24/2019. [19-1264] (GK) [Entered: 04/24/2019 04:11 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION to extend time to request a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia. Certificate of service dated 04/24/2019. [19-1264] (FLP) [Entered: 04/24/2019 03:10 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia. Certificate of service dated 04/02/2019. [19-1264] (VMM) [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:20 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia filed by Attorney Vivianne M. Marrero Torres. Certificate of service dated 03/28/2019. [19-1264] (VMM) [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 04/24/2019. Date of denial by district court: February 27, 2019. [19-1264] (TS) [Entered: 03/25/2019 10:19 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #37) filed by Appellant Jesus Rojas-Tapia. Docketing Statement due 04/02/2019. Appearance form due 04/02/2019. [19-1264] (AL) [Entered: 03/19/2019 05:16 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less